This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 12:19:15 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. v. PESSI GOLDSTEIN

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against PESSI GOLDSTEIN. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Jack Libert. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Jack Libert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

Pessi Goldstein

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHEERIN, JOHN J

Attorney at MULLOOLY, JEFFREY, ROONEY & FLYNN, LLP

ROONEY, TIMOTHY F

Attorney at MULLOLLY JEFFREY ROONEY & FLYNN

Defendant Attorney

FRIEDMAN, DANIEL LAWRENCE

Attorney at SACCO & FILLAS, LLP

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter to Withdraw Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter to Withdraw Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Plaintiffs Action and Defendants Counterclaims with Prejudice

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Plaintiffs Action and Defendants Counterclaims with Prejudice; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #001)

ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #001); Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #001) Adjournment Request

ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #001) Adjournment Request; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Request for Judicial Intervention

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #001) Assistant Secretary's Letter

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #001) Assistant Secretary's Letter; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001) Attorney Correspondence to Defendant

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001) Attorney Correspondence to Defendant; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Defendant's Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Defendant's Answer; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Verified Reply to Counterclaim

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Verified Reply to Counterclaim; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B BLUE BACK AND SECTION 130 AFFIRM

EXHIBIT(S) - B BLUE BACK AND SECTION 130 AFFIRM; Filed By: Friedman, D.; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A VERIFICATION

EXHIBIT(S) - A VERIFICATION; Filed By: Friedman, D.; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Friedman, D.; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT PESSI GOLDSTEIN

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT PESSI GOLDSTEIN; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter to Withdraw Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Plaintiffs Action and Defendants Counterclaims with Prejudice; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #001); Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #001) Adjournment Request; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #001) Assistant Secretary's Letter; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001) Attorney Correspondence to Defendant; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Defendant's Answer; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Verified Reply to Counterclaim; Filed By: Rooney, T.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B BLUE BACK AND SECTION 130 AFFIRM; Filed By: Friedman, D.; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A VERIFICATION; Filed By: Friedman, D.; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Friedman, D.; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT PESSI GOLDSTEIN; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less