Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 19:26:19 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. - v. - PABLO A. RIVERA et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2017 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PABLO A RIVERA. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2-17

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendants

if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the premises described in the complaint,

Josefina Rivera

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE COLLECTIONS AND CIVIL ENFORCEMENT DIV.

Gloria L. Goolsby A/K/A GLORIA L. JACKSON A/K/A GLORIA GOOLSBY

John Doe and/or Jane Doe #1-10 inclusive, the last ten names being fictitious and unknown to plaintiff, the persons or parties intended being the tenants, occupants, persons or corporations

ALBANY COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT AGENCY

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.

James L. Goolsby A/K/A JAMES GOOLSBY

HSBC MORTGAGE CORPORATION (USA)

Pablo A. Rivera A/K/A PABLO RIVERA A/K/A PABLO RIVERA-MEDINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NELSON, CHANTEE MARIA

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

GALLO, DAVID A

Attorney at DAVID A. GALLO & ASSOCIATES LLP

YAZZETTI, ERNEST ANTHONY

Attorney at Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

JACKSON, F MATTHEW

FARER, STEVEN DAVID

Attorney at FARER LAW FIRM, P.C.

 

Court Documents

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE entered by the clerk

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Gallo, D.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Gallo, D.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

NOTICE Notice of Opt-Out

NOTICE Notice of Opt-Out; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/01/2018; Received: 08/01/2018

STIPULATION - DISCOVERY

STIPULATION - DISCOVERY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/01/2018; Received: 08/01/2018

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF OPT OUT- GOOLSBY

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF OPT OUT- GOOLSBY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/30/2018; Received: 08/01/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Gallo, D.; Filed: 07/11/2018; Received: 07/11/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service and Legal Back

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service and Legal Back; Filed By: Gallo, D.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Note and Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Note and Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Gallo, D.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ALBANY COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT AGENCY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ALBANY COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT AGENCY; Filed By: Gallo, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEM, INC.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEM, INC.; Filed By: Gallo, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HSBC MORTGAGE CORPORATION (USA)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HSBC MORTGAGE CORPORATION (USA); Filed By: Gallo, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE COLLECTION

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE COLLECTION; Filed By: Gallo, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK BY SERVICE UPON CT CORPORATION SYSTEM AS REGISTERED AGENT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK BY SERVICE UPON CT CORPORATION SYSTEM AS REGISTERED AGENT; Filed By: Gallo, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gallo, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Gallo, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Gallo, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Gallo, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Gallo, D.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Gallo, D.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE Notice of Opt-Out; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/01/2018; Received: 08/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCOVERY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/01/2018; Received: 08/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF OPT OUT- GOOLSBY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/30/2018; Received: 08/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Gallo, D.; Filed: 07/11/2018; Received: 07/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service and Legal Back; Filed By: Gallo, D.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 Note and Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Gallo, D.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 Title Report Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Gallo, D.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOSEFINA RIVERA; Filed By: Gallo, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ALBANY COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT AGENCY; Filed By: Gallo, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEM, INC.; Filed By: Gallo, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HSBC MORTGAGE CORPORATION (USA); Filed By: Gallo, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE COLLECTION; Filed By: Gallo, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK BY SERVICE UPON CT CORPORATION SYSTEM AS REGISTERED AGENT; Filed By: Gallo, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gallo, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Gallo, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Gallo, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Gallo, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less