This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 16:22:30 (UTC).

Bank Of America, N.A. - v. - Meretta B Antino

Case Summary

On 06/13/2017 Bank Of America, N A filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Meretta B Antino. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of America, N.A.

Defendant

Meretta B Antino

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN, KEITH H

Attorney at RUBIN & ROTHMAN, LLC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

AFFIRMATION Non military-affirmation R&R File#: 1160909

AFFIRMATION Non military-affirmation R&R File#: 1160909; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE #: 1160909

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE #: 1160909; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Affidavit of Merit R&R File#: 1160909

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Affidavit of Merit R&R File#: 1160909; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment R&R file#: 1160909

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment R&R file#: 1160909; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1160909

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1160909; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Non military-affirmation R&R File#: 1160909; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE #: 1160909; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Affidavit of Merit R&R File#: 1160909; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment R&R file#: 1160909; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1160909; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less