Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/03/2020 at 00:51:42 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. v. MEGAN H MCGORMAN

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MEGAN H MCGORMAN. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2019

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

Megan H Mcgorman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN, KEITH H

Attorney at RUBIN & ROTHMAN, LLC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1303325

AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1303325; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1303325

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1303325; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS R&R FILE # 1303325

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS R&R FILE # 1303325; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1303325

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1303325; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1303325

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1303325; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1303325; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1303325; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS R&R FILE # 1303325; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1303325; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1303325; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less