This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 17:57:54 (UTC).

Bank of America, N.A. - v. - Martin Mendez Jr. et al

Case Summary

On 05/25/2017 Bank of America, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Martin Mendez Jr. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1005

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank of America, N.A.

Defendants

Martin Mendez jr.

JOHN DOE #1 through JOHN DOE #10 the last ten names being fictitious and unknown to the plaintiff, the person or parties intended being the persons or parties, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the Mortgaged premises described in

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FALASCO, TODD C

Attorney at FRENKEL, LAMBERT, WEISS, WEISMAN & GORDON

FEMMINELLA, NICOLE P

Attorney at FRENKEL, LAMBERT, WEISS, WEISMAN & GORDON, LLP

Bolduc, Kristin Marie

Attorney at Woods Oviatt Gilman, LLP

 

Court Documents

REPORT OF SALE (SURPLUS MONIES) -APPOINTED REFEREE

REPORT OF SALE (SURPLUS MONIES) -APPOINTED REFEREE; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 04/04/2018; Received: 04/04/2018

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 03/30/2018; Received: 03/30/2018

NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/02/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Femminella, N.; Filed: 12/11/2017; Received: 12/11/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Femminella, N.; Filed: 12/11/2017; Received: 12/11/2017

ORDER - OTHER Judgment of Foreclosure

ORDER - OTHER Judgment of Foreclosure; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE (Motion #02) Referee Signed Oath & Report of Amount Due Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE (Motion #02) Referee Signed Oath & Report of Amount Due Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Femminella, N.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #02)

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #02); Filed By: Femminella, N.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Non-Military Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Non-Military Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Femminella, N.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #01)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #01); Filed By: Femminella, N.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MARTIN MENDEZ JR

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MARTIN MENDEZ JR; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING FRENKEL

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING FRENKEL; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

AFFIRMATION JANE DOE

AFFIRMATION JANE DOE; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

AFFIRMATION JOHN DOE

AFFIRMATION JOHN DOE; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MARTIN MENDEZ JR

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MARTIN MENDEZ JR; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Certificate of Merit attached Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Certificate of Merit attached Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT OF SALE (SURPLUS MONIES) -APPOINTED REFEREE; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 04/04/2018; Received: 04/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 03/30/2018; Received: 03/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Femminella, N.; Filed: 12/11/2017; Received: 12/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Femminella, N.; Filed: 12/11/2017; Received: 12/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Judgment of Foreclosure; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE (Motion #02) Referee Signed Oath & Report of Amount Due Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Femminella, N.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS (Motion #02); Filed By: Femminella, N.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #02) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Femminella, N.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #01) Affirmation of Regularity; Filed By: Femminella, N.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Non-Military Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Femminella, N.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #01); Filed By: Femminella, N.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MARTIN MENDEZ JR; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING FRENKEL; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION JANE DOE; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION JOHN DOE; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MARTIN MENDEZ JR; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Certificate of Merit attached Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less