This case was last updated from Rockland County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 23:41:55 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA - v. - MAHESH C JANI

Case Summary

On 06/21/2017 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against MAHESH C JANI. This case was filed in Rockland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Rockland County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Rockland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

Mahesh C Jani

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN, KEITH H

Attorney at RUBIN & ROTHMAN, LLC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on September 05, 2018

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on September 05, 2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/05/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

AFFIRMATION NON-MIL R&R FILE # 1229799

AFFIRMATION NON-MIL R&R FILE # 1229799; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 09/05/2018; Received: 09/05/2018

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE #1229799

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE #1229799; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 09/05/2018; Received: 09/05/2018

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/23/2018; Received: 07/23/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY 1229799- ORDER WITH NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY 1229799- ORDER WITH NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 06/05/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/01/2018; Received: 06/01/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service - Motion

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service - Motion; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 05/04/2018; Received: 05/04/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #002) Letter withdrawing previous MSJ

EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #002) Letter withdrawing previous MSJ; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 05/04/2018; Received: 05/04/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #002) Reply to Counterclaim

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #002) Reply to Counterclaim; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 05/04/2018; Received: 05/04/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #001) Asst Secretary

EXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #001) Asst Secretary; Filed By: Sharinn, S.; Filed: 12/11/2017; Received: 12/11/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #001) Cardholder Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #001) Cardholder Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Sharinn, S.; Filed: 12/11/2017; Received: 12/11/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*; Filed By: Sharinn, S.; Filed: 12/11/2017; Received: 12/15/2017

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Moreno, A.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

ANSWER WITH DEFENSES & COUNTERCLAIMS

ANSWER WITH DEFENSES & COUNTERCLAIMS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Moreno, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Moreno, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Moreno, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on September 05, 2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/05/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION NON-MIL R&R FILE # 1229799; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 09/05/2018; Received: 09/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE #1229799; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 09/05/2018; Received: 09/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/23/2018; Received: 07/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY 1229799- ORDER WITH NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 06/05/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/01/2018; Received: 06/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service - Motion; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 05/04/2018; Received: 05/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #002) Letter withdrawing previous MSJ; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 05/04/2018; Received: 05/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #002) Reply to Counterclaim; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 05/04/2018; Received: 05/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #002) Answer with Counterclaim; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 05/04/2018; Received: 05/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - c (Motion #001) Truth in Lending Disclosure; Filed By: Sharinn, S.; Filed: 12/11/2017; Received: 12/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #001) Asst Secretary; Filed By: Sharinn, S.; Filed: 12/11/2017; Received: 12/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #001) Cardholder Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Sharinn, S.; Filed: 12/11/2017; Received: 12/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*; Filed By: Sharinn, S.; Filed: 12/11/2017; Received: 12/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Moreno, A.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH DEFENSES & COUNTERCLAIMS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Moreno, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Moreno, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Moreno, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less