This case was last updated from Rockland County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 10:45:44 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA - v. - KIMBERLEE B ROSE

Case Summary

On 05/17/2017 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against KIMBERLEE B ROSE. This case was filed in Rockland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Rockland County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Rockland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

Kimberlee B Rose

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN, KEITH H

Attorney at RUBIN & ROTHMAN, LLC

 

Court Documents

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 06/11/2018; Received: 06/11/2018

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on January 16, 2018

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on January 16, 2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/12/2017; Received: 12/12/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E BANK STATEMENT

EXHIBIT(S) - E BANK STATEMENT; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 11/24/2017; Received: 11/24/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D MILITARY STATUS

EXHIBIT(S) - D MILITARY STATUS; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 11/24/2017; Received: 11/24/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C LAWSUIT NOTICE

EXHIBIT(S) - C LAWSUIT NOTICE; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 11/24/2017; Received: 11/24/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B MILITARY AFFIRMATION

EXHIBIT(S) - B MILITARY AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 11/24/2017; Received: 11/24/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A AFFIDAVIT

EXHIBIT(S) - A AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 11/24/2017; Received: 11/24/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 11/24/2017; Received: 11/24/2017

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 11/24/2017; Received: 11/24/2017

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 11/24/2017; Received: 11/24/2017

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 11/24/2017; Received: 11/24/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Moreno, A. - filed by J&E Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Moreno, A. - filed by J&E Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Moreno, A. - filed by J&E Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 06/11/2018; Received: 06/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on January 16, 2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/12/2017; Received: 12/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E BANK STATEMENT; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 11/24/2017; Received: 11/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D MILITARY STATUS; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 11/24/2017; Received: 11/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C LAWSUIT NOTICE; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 11/24/2017; Received: 11/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B MILITARY AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 11/24/2017; Received: 11/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 11/24/2017; Received: 11/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 11/24/2017; Received: 11/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 11/24/2017; Received: 11/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 11/24/2017; Received: 11/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Hughes, A. - filed by Allied Process Service; Filed: 11/24/2017; Received: 11/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Moreno, A. - filed by J&E Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Moreno, A. - filed by J&E Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Moreno, A. - filed by J&E Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less