Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 03/10/2020 at 13:45:17 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA N.A. v. HERMAN P ORTIZ

Case Summary

On 08/03/2019 BANK OF AMERICA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERMAN P ORTIZ. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant

Herman P Ortiz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHEERIN, JOHN J

Attorney at MULLOOLY, JEFFREY, ROONEY & FLYNN, LLP

FLYNN, GERALD W

Attorney at GERALD W. FLYNN

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 STATEMENTS

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 STATEMENTS; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27 PROOF OF MAILING

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27 PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/18/2019; Received: 08/18/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/03/2019; Received: 08/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A

EXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/03/2019; Received: 08/03/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* HERMAN P ORTIZ

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* HERMAN P ORTIZ; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/03/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 STATEMENTS; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27 PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/18/2019; Received: 08/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/03/2019; Received: 08/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/03/2019; Received: 08/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* HERMAN P ORTIZ; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/03/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less