This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 12:39:16 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. v. FRANCIS J. HOYT et al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FRANCIS J HOYT. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Gerard J Neri. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0678

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Gerard J Neri

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendants

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

Francis J. Hoyt AS EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF EVELYN HOYT

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

Not Yet Classified

David J. Philippone appointed referee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HYMAN, SARAH KRISTIN

GAZZO, NICOLE CAROL

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY, LLC

POLOWY, AMY E.

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY LLC

POULOS, AMBER ROSE

Attorney at Law Office of Amber R. Poulos

PASCUZZI, ASHLEY MARIE

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY, LLC

KIELICH, MATTHEW ALAN

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

Defendant Attorney

LARKIN, WILLIAM F

Attorney at US ATTORNEYS OFFICE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF N.Y.

Not Yet Classified Attorney

PHILIPPONE, DAVID J.

Attorney at OOT & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Kielich, M.; Filed: 02/07/2020; Received: 02/07/2020

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Kielich, M.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Philippone, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #02)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #02); Filed By: Kielich, M.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

DECISION/ORDER + JUDGMENT (Motion #02)

DECISION/ORDER + JUDGMENT (Motion #02); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #02)

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #02); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #02) Court taking motion on submission

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #02) Court taking motion on submission; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #02)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #02); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 09/26/2019; Received: 09/26/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #02)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #02); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FRANCIS J. HOYT AS EXECUTOR 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FRANCIS J. HOYT AS EXECUTOR 3215; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FRANCIS J. HOYT AS EXECUTOR

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FRANCIS J. HOYT AS EXECUTOR; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE USA HUD AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE USA HUD AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE USA HUD AOM

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE USA HUD AOM; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING E-Filing Authorization

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING E-Filing Authorization; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service People of the State of New York

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service People of the State of New York; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Kielich, M.; Filed: 02/07/2020; Received: 02/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Kielich, M.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Philippone, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #02); Filed By: Kielich, M.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION/ORDER + JUDGMENT (Motion #02); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #02); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #02) Court taking motion on submission; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #02); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 09/26/2019; Received: 09/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #02); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS (Motion #02) *Corrected*; Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FRANCIS J. HOYT AS EXECUTOR 3215; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FRANCIS J. HOYT AS EXECUTOR; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE USA HUD AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE USA HUD AOM; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING E-Filing Authorization; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service People of the State of New York; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less