Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/03/2020 at 14:17:32 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. v. DONN T KING

Case Summary

On 07/26/2019 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DONN T KING. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2019

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

Donn T King

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHEERIN, JOHN J

Attorney at MULLOOLY, JEFFREY, ROONEY & FLYNN, LLP

FLYNN, GERALD W

Attorney at GERALD W. FLYNN

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 BANK STATEMENT

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 BANK STATEMENT; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

NOTICE RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE)

NOTICE RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT DONN T KING

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT DONN T KING; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 BANK STATEMENT; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT DONN T KING; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less