Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 04/19/2021 at 11:08:05 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. v. DEBRA GLUCK

Case Summary

On 04/26/2019 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DEBRA GLUCK. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly Eskew and Catherine M Bartlett. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

Judge Details

Judges

Kelly Eskew

Catherine M Bartlett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

Debra Gluck

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN, KEITH H

Attorney at RUBIN & ROTHMAN, LLC

Defendant Attorney

VanZyverden, William

Attorney at Hemming & Associates, P.C.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/17/2021; Received: 03/17/2021

AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1289990

AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1289990; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 03/17/2021; Received: 03/17/2021

AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1289990

AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1289990; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 03/17/2021; Received: 03/17/2021

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1289990

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1289990; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 03/17/2021; Received: 03/17/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/18/2021; Received: 01/18/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1); Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/18/2021; Received: 01/18/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 12/29/2020; Received: 12/29/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 12/29/2020; Received: 12/29/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1289990

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1289990; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/17/2021; Received: 03/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1289990; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 03/17/2021; Received: 03/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1289990; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 03/17/2021; Received: 03/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1289990; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 03/17/2021; Received: 03/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/18/2021; Received: 01/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1); Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/18/2021; Received: 01/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Proof of Service; Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 01/07/2021; Received: 01/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 12/29/2020; Received: 12/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 12/29/2020; Received: 12/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 12/29/2020; Received: 12/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1289990; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less