Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 13:46:01 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. v. CHANDRA R FITZSIMMONS

Case Summary

On 02/09/2019 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHANDRA R FITZSIMMONS. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

Chandra R Fitzsimmons

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHEERIN, JOHN J

Attorney at MULLOOLY, JEFFREY, ROONEY & FLYNN, LLP

FLYNN, GERALD W

Attorney at GERALD W. FLYNN

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Bank Statement

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Bank Statement; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 03/07/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 03/07/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHANDRA R FITZSIMMONS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHANDRA R FITZSIMMONS; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 02/09/2019; Received: 02/09/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT CHANDRA R FITZSIMMONS

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT CHANDRA R FITZSIMMONS; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 02/09/2019; Received: 02/09/2019

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Bank Statement; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 03/07/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHANDRA R FITZSIMMONS; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 02/09/2019; Received: 02/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT CHANDRA R FITZSIMMONS; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 02/09/2019; Received: 02/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less