This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 17:21:56 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. v. ARGENT MORTGAGE COMPANY, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ARGENT MORTGAGE COMPANY, LLC. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0105

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

ARGENT MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC

DUNKIRK HOME PROPERTIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANGELO, JANET M

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY *Corrected*

NOTICE OF ENTRY *Corrected*; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected* affirmation of mailing notice of entry

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected* affirmation of mailing notice of entry; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

ORDER - FINAL (Motion #1)

ORDER - FINAL (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) SERVICE ON DUNKIRK HOME

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) SERVICE ON DUNKIRK HOME; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) SERVICE ON ARGENT MORTGAGE

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) SERVICE ON ARGENT MORTGAGE; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) DEED

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) DEED; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) lender affidavit in support

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) lender affidavit in support; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Dangelo, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ARGENT MORTGAGE COMPANY, LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ARGENT MORTGAGE COMPANY, LLC; Filed By: Dangelo, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DUNKIRK HOME PROPERTIES LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DUNKIRK HOME PROPERTIES LLC; Filed By: Dangelo, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B DEED

EXHIBIT(S) - B DEED; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A MORTGAGE

EXHIBIT(S) - A MORTGAGE; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY *Corrected*; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected* affirmation of mailing notice of entry; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - FINAL (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) SERVICE ON DUNKIRK HOME; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) SERVICE ON ARGENT MORTGAGE; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) DEED; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) MORTGAGE; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) discharge of mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) lender affidavit in support; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Dangelo, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ARGENT MORTGAGE COMPANY, LLC; Filed By: Dangelo, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DUNKIRK HOME PROPERTIES LLC; Filed By: Dangelo, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B DEED; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A MORTGAGE; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less