This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 09/30/2020 at 04:29:18 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. v. 121 COMMUNICATIONS, INC et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against 121 COMMUNICATIONS, INC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard Velasquez Pt 66. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2008

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Richard Velasquez Pt 66

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. f/k/a FLEET NATIONAL BANK

Defendants

Paul Levy

121 COMMUNICATIONS, INC

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - OTHER AND CONSENT TO E-FILING

STIPULATION - OTHER AND CONSENT TO E-FILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/23/2020; Received: 09/25/2020

JUDGMENT ASSIGNMENT

JUDGMENT ASSIGNMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 09/25/2020

JUDGMENT STATEMENT

JUDGMENT STATEMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/27/2008; Received: 09/25/2020

RJI -RE: OTHER

RJI -RE: OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/18/2020; Received: 09/25/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/07/2008; Received: 09/25/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER AND CONSENT TO E-FILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/23/2020; Received: 09/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/18/2020; Received: 09/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT ASSIGNMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 09/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT STATEMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/27/2008; Received: 09/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/07/2008; Received: 09/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less