Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 17:07:04 (UTC).

Bank of America, N.A., successor by merger to Fleet National Bank, as successor by merger to Fleet Bank - v. - Michael Smith

Case Summary

On 06/30/2017 Bank of America, N A , successor by merger to Fleet National Bank, as successor by merger to Fleet Bank filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Michael Smith. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1247

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank of America, N.A., successor by merger to Fleet National Bank, as successor by merger to Fleet Bank

Defendant

Michael Smith a/k/a Michael T. Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANFREDI, JOHN S

Attorney at MANFREDI LAW GROUP, PLLC

Defendant Attorney

ZIELENSKI-MCGAHEY, ANNE M.

Attorney at KELLY & WALTHALL, PC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/15/2018; Received: 03/15/2018

ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #01) *Corrected*

ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #01) *Corrected*; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 03/15/2018

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) proposed judgment

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) proposed judgment; Filed By: Manfredi, J.; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #01)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #01); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Zielenski-Mcgahey, A.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #01)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #01); Filed By: Zielenski-Mcgahey, A.; Filed: 11/21/2017; Received: 11/21/2017

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #01)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #01); Filed By: Manfredi, J.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01); Filed By: Manfredi, J.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - g (Motion #01) exhbit g

EXHIBIT(S) - g (Motion #01) exhbit g; Filed By: Manfredi, J.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Zielenski-Mcgahey, A.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Manfredi, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL SMITH 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL SMITH 3215; Filed By: Manfredi, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL SMITH

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL SMITH; Filed By: Manfredi, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - d exhibit d

EXHIBIT(S) - d exhibit d; Filed By: Manfredi, J.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - c exhibit c

EXHIBIT(S) - c exhibit c; Filed By: Manfredi, J.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - b exhibit b

EXHIBIT(S) - b exhibit b; Filed By: Manfredi, J.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - a exhibit a

EXHIBIT(S) - a exhibit a; Filed By: Manfredi, J.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT summons and complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT summons and complaint; Filed By: Manfredi, J.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/15/2018; Received: 03/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #01) *Corrected*; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 03/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) proposed judgment; Filed By: Manfredi, J.; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #01); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Zielenski-Mcgahey, A.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #01); Filed By: Zielenski-Mcgahey, A.; Filed: 11/21/2017; Received: 11/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #01); Filed By: Manfredi, J.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01); Filed By: Manfredi, J.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - g (Motion #01) exhbit g; Filed By: Manfredi, J.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) reply; Filed By: Manfredi, J.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Zielenski-Mcgahey, A.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Manfredi, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL SMITH 3215; Filed By: Manfredi, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL SMITH; Filed By: Manfredi, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - d exhibit d; Filed By: Manfredi, J.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - c exhibit c; Filed By: Manfredi, J.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - b exhibit b; Filed By: Manfredi, J.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - a exhibit a; Filed By: Manfredi, J.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT summons and complaint; Filed By: Manfredi, J.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less