This case was last updated from Westchester County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 21:48:59 (UTC).

Bank of America, N.A. sbm BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP FKA Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP v. Randi Cusack et al

Case Summary

On 05/08/2017 Bank of America, N A sbm BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP FKA Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Randi Cusack. This case was filed in Westchester County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Westchester County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Westchester, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank of America, N.A. sbm BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP FKA Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP

Defendants

Scott Johnson

Randi Cusack

CIT Bank, NA fka One West Bank, NA sba IndyMac Bank, F.S.B.

Not Yet Classified

Michael V Curti Referee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WALLACE, STEPHEN JOHN

Attorney at FRENKEL, LAMBERT, WEISS, WEISMAN & GORDON, LLP

FEMMINELLA, NICOLE P

Attorney at FRENKEL, LAMBERT, WEISS, WEISMAN & GORDON, LLP

BURLINGAME, NANCY G

Attorney at FRENKEL LAMBERT WEISS WEISMAN & GORDON, LLP

Bolduc, Kristin Marie

Attorney at Woods Oviatt Gilman, LLP

ZEGARELLI, THOMAS MATTHEW

Attorney at Frenkel, Lambert, Weiss, Weisman, & Gordon, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

FLYNN, ERIN K

Attorney at Clair & Gjertsen

AUFRECHT, MARY KATHRYN

Attorney at Clair & Gjertsen, Esqs

CLAIR, IRA S

Attorney at Clair & Gjertsen, Esqs.

Not Yet Classified Attorney

CURTI, MICHAEL V

Attorney at Harris Beach, PLLC

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #3)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #3); Filed By: Burlingame, N.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #3)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Flynn, E.; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE (Motion #3) Referee's Signed Oath and Report of Amount Due Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE (Motion #3) Referee's Signed Oath and Report of Amount Due Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #3)

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #3); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - LET (Motion #3) Exhibits A through GG Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - LET (Motion #3) Exhibits A through GG Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #3)

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #3); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Clair, I.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING FRENKEL

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING FRENKEL; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SCOTT JOHNSON

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SCOTT JOHNSON; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RANDI CUSACK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RANDI CUSACK; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

AFFIRMATION JOHN DOE

AFFIRMATION JOHN DOE; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

AFFIRMATION JANE DOE

AFFIRMATION JANE DOE; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANY AND ALL TENANTS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANY AND ALL TENANTS; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 05/08/2017; Received: 05/08/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Certificate of Merit attached Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Certificate of Merit attached Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 05/08/2017; Received: 05/08/2017

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #3); Filed By: Burlingame, N.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Flynn, E.; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #3); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE (Motion #3) Referee's Signed Oath and Report of Amount Due Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS (Motion #3); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - LET (Motion #3) Exhibits A through GG Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #3); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Zegarelli, T.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Discovery; Filed By: Clair, I.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Clair, I.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING FRENKEL; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SCOTT JOHNSON; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RANDI CUSACK; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION JOHN DOE; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION JANE DOE; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANY AND ALL TENANTS; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 05/08/2017; Received: 05/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Certificate of Merit attached Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 05/08/2017; Received: 05/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less