This case was last updated from Essex County Courts on 03/03/2020 at 00:16:04 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. et al v. CLORINDA A MOORE

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CLORINDA A MOORE. This case was filed in Essex County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0342

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Essex County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Essex, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

BANK OF AMERICA N A

Defendant

Clorinda A Moore

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN, KEITH H

Attorney at RUBIN & ROTHMAN, LLC

 

Court Documents

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1303737

AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1303737; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1303737

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1303737; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1303737

AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1303737; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1303737

AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1303737; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS R&R FILE # 1303737

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS R&R FILE # 1303737; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1303737

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1303737; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1303737; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1303737; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1303737; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1303737; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS R&R FILE # 1303737; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1303737; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less