This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 07/07/2022 at 01:14:18 (UTC).

BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING LP et al v. DEBRA GIPPI

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING LP filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DEBRA GIPPI. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas R Davis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2022

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Thomas R Davis

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING LP

COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS SERVICING LP

Defendant

Debra Gippi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORISKIN, SARA Z.

 

Court Documents

COURT NOTICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Q- Settlement Order

EXHIBIT(S)

P- Notice of Entry

EXHIBIT(S)

O- Consent to Change Attorney

EXHIBIT(S)

N- Court Decision Dated 01/25/2022 & Bankruptcy Discharge

EXHIBIT(S)

M- Affirmation of Regularity

EXHIBIT(S)

L- Affidavit of Merit & Amount Due

EXHIBIT(S)

K- 3215

EXHIBIT(S)

B- Note

EXHIBIT(S)

A- N/A

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

Proposed Order of Reference and Default Judgment

AFFIRMATION

Affirmation in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for an Order of Reference

SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION

Redaction Cover Page

NOTICE OF MOTION

Notice of Motion for an Order of Reference

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/13/2022; Received: 05/13/2022

APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING

APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/13/2022; Received: 05/13/2022

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/13/2022; Received: 05/13/2022

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/13/2022; Received: 06/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 06/13/2022; Received: 06/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #2) Q- Settlement Order; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 06/08/2022; Received: 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #2) P- Notice of Entry; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 06/08/2022; Received: 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #2) O- Consent to Change Attorney Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 06/08/2022; Received: 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #2) N- Court Decision Dated 01/25/2022 & Bankruptcy Discharge; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 06/08/2022; Received: 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #2) M- Affirmation of Regularity; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 06/08/2022; Received: 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #2) L- Affidavit of Merit & Amount Due; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 06/08/2022; Received: 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #2) K- 3215; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 06/08/2022; Received: 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #2) J- Service of Process Affidavits; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 06/08/2022; Received: 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) C- Mortgage; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 06/08/2022; Received: 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) B- Note; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 06/08/2022; Received: 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) A- N/A; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 06/08/2022; Received: 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) Proposed Order of Reference and Default Judgment; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 06/08/2022; Received: 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for an Order of Reference; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 06/08/2022; Received: 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #2) Redaction Cover Page; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 06/08/2022; Received: 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) Notice of Motion for an Order of Reference; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 06/08/2022; Received: 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/13/2022; Received: 05/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/13/2022; Received: 05/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/13/2022; Received: 05/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less