This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 01:05:03 (UTC).

Autovest, L.L.C. v. Mary T. Curwin

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 Autovest, L L C filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mary T Curwin. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Autovest, L.L.C.

Defendant

Mary T. Curwin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CANO, PILAR A

Attorney at Powhida & Cano, PLLC

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement of Judgment and Affidavit of Account

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement of Judgment and Affidavit of Account; Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Explanation of Deficiency and payment history Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C Explanation of Deficiency and payment history Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on July 17, 2019

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on July 17, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Bill of Sale and Assignment and Original Debt Sale Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Bill of Sale and Assignment and Original Debt Sale Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Additional Mailing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Additional Mailing; Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Retail Installment Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - A Retail Installment Contract; Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on July 17, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Additional Mailing; Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement of Judgment and Affidavit of Account; Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Explanation of Deficiency and payment history Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Bill of Sale and Assignment and Original Debt Sale Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Retail Installment Contract; Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less