This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 09/25/2023 at 18:10:54 (UTC).

ASP Watch Guard & Patrol Inc. v. 17th Street Entertainment II LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2023 ASP Watch Guard Patrol Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 17th Street Entertainment II LLC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in New York, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Lyle E. Frank. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2023

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Lyle E. Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASP Watch Guard & Patrol Inc. d/b/a ASP Consultants

Defendants

17th Street Entertainment II LLC d/b/a 1 OAK New York d/b/a 1 OAK NYC

244 West 14th Street LLC d/b/a Up & Down d/b/a The*Darby NYC d/b/a The*Darby

Butter Management LLC d/b/a Butter Group

Danucht Entertainment LLC

Richard Akiva a/k/a Richie Akiva

Jaqueline Akiva

ABC Corp.

XYZ LLC

John Does 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LIEBERMAN, HAMUTAL

MORRIS, TYLER HARRISON

 

Court Documents

SERVICE ON SUPREME COURT CLERK (GENL. CLERK) W/COPY OF ORDER (Motion #001) Notice of Entry to Supreme Court Clerk (General Clerk) of Aug. 15, 2023 Order amending caption

SERVICE ON SUPREME COURT CLERK (GENL. CLERK) W/COPY OF ORDER (Motion #001) Notice of Entry to Supreme Court Clerk (General Clerk) of Aug. 15, 2023 Order amending caption; Filed By: Wein, S.; Filed: 09/07/2023; Received: 09/07/2023

NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C) (Motion #001) Notice to County Clerk - CPLR 8019 (c) of August 15, 2023 Order amending caption

NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C) (Motion #001) Notice to County Clerk - CPLR 8019 (c) of August 15, 2023 Order amending caption; Filed By: Wein, S.; Filed: 09/07/2023; Received: 09/07/2023

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry of Decision + Order on Motion dated Aug. 15, 2023 (NYSCEF No. 35)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry of Decision + Order on Motion dated Aug. 15, 2023 (NYSCEF No. 35); Filed By: Wein, S.; Filed: 08/25/2023; Received: 08/25/2023

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance of Spencer D. Wein on behalf of Defendant Katz Group USA Corp.

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance of Spencer D. Wein on behalf of Defendant Katz Group USA Corp.; Filed By: Wein, S.; Filed: 08/25/2023; Received: 08/25/2023

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/15/2023; Received: 08/15/2023

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Pledge Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Pledge Agreement; Filed By: Cacciola, M.; Filed: 07/14/2023; Received: 07/14/2023

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Security Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Security Agreement; Filed By: Cacciola, M.; Filed: 07/14/2023; Received: 07/14/2023

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Credit Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Credit Agreement; Filed By: Cacciola, M.; Filed: 07/14/2023; Received: 07/14/2023

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Cacciola, M.; Filed: 07/14/2023; Received: 07/14/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Richie Akiva

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Richie Akiva; Filed By: Dawson, E.; Filed: 04/04/2023; Received: 04/04/2023

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Cacciola, M.; Filed: 03/27/2023; Received: 03/27/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Jaqueline Akiva

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Jaqueline Akiva; Filed By: Dawson, E.; Filed: 03/13/2023; Received: 03/13/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Danucht Entertainment LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Danucht Entertainment LLC; Filed By: Dawson, E.; Filed: 03/09/2023; Received: 03/09/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Butter Management LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Butter Management LLC; Filed By: Dawson, E.; Filed: 03/09/2023; Received: 03/09/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on 244 West 14th LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on 244 West 14th LLC; Filed By: Dawson, E.; Filed: 03/09/2023; Received: 03/09/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on 17th Street Entertainment II LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on 17th Street Entertainment II LLC; Filed By: Dawson, E.; Filed: 03/07/2023; Received: 03/07/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Katz Group USA Corp.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Katz Group USA Corp.; Filed By: Dawson, E.; Filed: 03/03/2023; Received: 03/03/2023

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Dawson, E.; Filed: 02/10/2023; Received: 02/10/2023

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE ON SUPREME COURT CLERK (GENL. CLERK) W/COPY OF ORDER (Motion #001) Notice of Entry to Supreme Court Clerk (General Clerk) of Aug. 15, 2023 Order amending caption; Filed By: Wein, S.; Filed: 09/07/2023; Received: 09/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C) (Motion #001) Notice to County Clerk - CPLR 8019 (c) of August 15, 2023 Order amending caption; Filed By: Wein, S.; Filed: 09/07/2023; Received: 09/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry of Decision + Order on Motion dated Aug. 15, 2023 (NYSCEF No. 35); Filed By: Wein, S.; Filed: 08/25/2023; Received: 08/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance of Spencer D. Wein on behalf of Defendant Katz Group USA Corp.; Filed By: Wein, S.; Filed: 08/25/2023; Received: 08/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/15/2023; Received: 08/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Pledge Agreement; Filed By: Cacciola, M.; Filed: 07/14/2023; Received: 07/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Security Agreement; Filed By: Cacciola, M.; Filed: 07/14/2023; Received: 07/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Credit Agreement; Filed By: Cacciola, M.; Filed: 07/14/2023; Received: 07/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Cacciola, M.; Filed: 07/14/2023; Received: 07/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Katz Name Change; Filed By: Cacciola, M.; Filed: 07/14/2023; Received: 07/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*; Filed By: Cacciola, M.; Filed: 05/12/2023; Received: 05/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Richie Akiva; Filed By: Dawson, E.; Filed: 04/04/2023; Received: 04/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Cacciola, M.; Filed: 03/27/2023; Received: 03/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Jaqueline Akiva; Filed By: Dawson, E.; Filed: 03/13/2023; Received: 03/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Danucht Entertainment LLC; Filed By: Dawson, E.; Filed: 03/09/2023; Received: 03/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Butter Management LLC; Filed By: Dawson, E.; Filed: 03/09/2023; Received: 03/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on 244 West 14th LLC; Filed By: Dawson, E.; Filed: 03/09/2023; Received: 03/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on 17th Street Entertainment II LLC; Filed By: Dawson, E.; Filed: 03/07/2023; Received: 03/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Katz Group USA Corp.; Filed By: Dawson, E.; Filed: 03/03/2023; Received: 03/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Dawson, E.; Filed: 02/10/2023; Received: 02/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less