This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 18:13:39 (UTC).

ASHLEY L. MAIORANA - v. - ANGEL M. MELENDEZ et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2017 ASHLEY L MAIORANA filed an Other lawsuit against ANGEL M MELENDEZ. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashley L. Maiorana

Defendants

Angel M. Melendez

Ivette Melendez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENBLATT, HELEN M.

Defendant Attorneys

SCHWARTZ, GLENN DAVID

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DENNIS BARTLING

PANEK, LEIGH ANN

Attorney at Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Schwartz, G. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Schwartz, G. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/10/2018; Received: 01/10/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Schwartz, G. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Schwartz, G. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Schwartz, G. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Panek, L. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Panek, L. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR ANGEL M. MELENDEZ

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR ANGEL M. MELENDEZ; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR IVETTE MELENDEZ

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR IVETTE MELENDEZ; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Schwartz, G. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Schwartz, G. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/10/2018; Received: 01/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Schwartz, G. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Schwartz, G. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Schwartz, G. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Panek, L. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Panek, L. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR ANGEL M. MELENDEZ; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR IVETTE MELENDEZ; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less