This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 06/28/2020 at 06:46:51 (UTC).

ARNET THOMPSON et al v. ANTONIO FOJAS M.D. et al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2019 ARNET THOMPSON filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ANTONIO FOJAS M D. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is George J. Silver - Gjs6. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

George J. Silver - Gjs6

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Arnet Thompson , as Administrator of the Estate of ROY BYFIELD, deceased

Arnet Thompson Individually

Defendants

MONTEFIORE MEDICAL CENTER

Antonio Fojas M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALPERN, AARON S

Attorney at The Jacob D. Fuchsberg Law Firm, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

MAKRIS, JAMES STEPHEN

Attorney at Sheeley LLP

SHEELEY, ANDREW THOMAS

Attorney at Sheeley LLP

GREEN, JEREMY A.

Attorney at Sheeley LLP

AJIBOYE, ANITA

Attorney at Sheeley LLP

SINGER, SCOTT RANDALL

Attorney at SHEELEY LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE JANUARY 22, 2020

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE JANUARY 22, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Halpern, A.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Halpern, A.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Halpern, A.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Pleadings

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Pleadings; Filed By: Halpern, A.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Exchange of Authorizations Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Exchange of Authorizations Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Halpern, A.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE Notice of Medical, Dental or Podiatric Malpractice Action

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE Notice of Medical, Dental or Podiatric Malpractice Action; Filed By: Halpern, A.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

DEMAND FOR: Combined Demands

DEMAND FOR: Combined Demands; Filed By: Makris, J.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS as to Dr. Fojas

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS as to Dr. Fojas; Filed By: Makris, J.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS as to Montefiore

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS as to Montefiore; Filed By: Makris, J.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Makris, J.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Notice of Electronic Filing with Summons and Verified Complaint with Certificat(..)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Notice of Electronic Filing with Summons and Verified Complaint with Certificat(..); Filed By: Halpern, A.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Notice of Electronic Filing with Summons and Verified Complaint with Certificat(..)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Notice of Electronic Filing with Summons and Verified Complaint with Certificat(..); Filed By: Halpern, A.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

SUPPORTING PLEADINGS Notice of Electronic Filing - Montefiore Medical Center

SUPPORTING PLEADINGS Notice of Electronic Filing - Montefiore Medical Center; Filed By: Halpern, A.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

SUPPORTING PLEADINGS Notice of Electronic Filing - Antonio Fojas, M.D.

SUPPORTING PLEADINGS Notice of Electronic Filing - Antonio Fojas, M.D.; Filed By: Halpern, A.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Halpern, A.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE JANUARY 22, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Halpern, A.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Halpern, A.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Halpern, A.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Pleadings; Filed By: Halpern, A.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Exchange of Authorizations Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Halpern, A.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE Notice of Medical, Dental or Podiatric Malpractice Action; Filed By: Halpern, A.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Combined Demands; Filed By: Makris, J.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS as to Dr. Fojas; Filed By: Makris, J.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS as to Montefiore; Filed By: Makris, J.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Makris, J.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Notice of Electronic Filing with Summons and Verified Complaint with Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Halpern, A.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Notice of Electronic Filing with Summons and Verified Complaint with Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Halpern, A.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPORTING PLEADINGS Notice of Electronic Filing - Montefiore Medical Center; Filed By: Halpern, A.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPORTING PLEADINGS Notice of Electronic Filing - Antonio Fojas, M.D.; Filed By: Halpern, A.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Halpern, A.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less