This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 04/30/2020 at 00:44:08 (UTC).

ARK-OPS LLC DBA FUSION CAPITAL - v. - CITY FUEL NY CORP et al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2018 ARK-OPS LLC DBA FUSION CAPITAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CITY FUEL NY CORP. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARK-OPS LLC DBA FUSION CAPITAL

Defendants

Jean M Dauria

CITY FUEL NY CORP

Not Yet Classified

ONE WORLD JUDICIAL SERVICES INC.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorney

MURTHA, TIMOTHY J

Attorney at ROACH & MURTHA P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

ORDER - MOTION - SHORT FORM (Motion #001) Granted on Default

ORDER - MOTION - SHORT FORM (Motion #001) Granted on Default; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) defendants entity status

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) defendants entity status; Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Judgment

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Judgment; Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on August 20, 2018

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on August 20, 2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/20/2018; Received: 08/20/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A FINAL JUDGMENT

EXHIBIT(S) - A FINAL JUDGMENT; Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE ADDITIONAL MAILING WITH S&C AND AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE ADDITIONAL MAILING WITH S&C AND AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Murtha, T. - filed by Cortina, S.; Filed: 05/24/2018; Received: 05/24/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Murtha, T. - filed by Cortina, S.; Filed: 05/21/2018; Received: 05/21/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Murtha, T. - filed by Cortina, S.; Filed: 05/21/2018; Received: 05/21/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - SHORT FORM (Motion #001) Granted on Default; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) defendants entity status; Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Judgment; Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on August 20, 2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/20/2018; Received: 08/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A FINAL JUDGMENT; Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ADDITIONAL MAILING WITH S&C AND AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Murtha, T. - filed by Cortina, S.; Filed: 05/24/2018; Received: 05/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Murtha, T. - filed by Cortina, S.; Filed: 05/21/2018; Received: 05/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Murtha, T. - filed by Cortina, S.; Filed: 05/21/2018; Received: 05/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less