This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 14:17:21 (UTC).

ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. LSI GENERAL CONTRACTING CORP.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LSI GENERAL CONTRACTING CORP. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

LSI GENERAL CONTRACTING CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FINKLER, DAVID J

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DAVID J. FINLER, P.C C/O FINDER & CUOMO

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A-F BINDER, ENDORSEMENT,LETTER,SUMMONS,AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE,AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL SERVICE

EXHIBIT(S) - A-F BINDER, ENDORSEMENT,LETTER,SUMMONS,AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE,AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL SERVICE; Filed By: Finkler, D.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT

AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Finkler, D.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Finkler, D.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

BILL OF COSTS

BILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Finkler, D.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Finkler, D.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Finkler, D.; Filed: 02/08/2019; Received: 02/08/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Finkler, D.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A-F BINDER, ENDORSEMENT,LETTER,SUMMONS,AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE,AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL SERVICE; Filed By: Finkler, D.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Finkler, D.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Finkler, D.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Finkler, D.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Finkler, D.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Finkler, D.; Filed: 02/08/2019; Received: 02/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Finkler, D.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less