This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 00:36:44 (UTC).

Anupam Sukhrani - v. - Richard Mancini et al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2017 Anupam Sukhrani filed an Other lawsuit against Richard Mancini. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******017E

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anupam Sukhrani

Defendants

Chris Mancini

Richard Mancini

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hall, Christina Tanya

Attorney at Law Office of Chrisitna T. Hall

Defendant Attorney

FENDT, ERIC GARY

Attorney at Law Offices of John Trop

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Office of John Trop; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Office of John Trop; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 10/22/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 10/22/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001); Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Exhibit D- Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Exhibit D- Answer; Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Exhibit C - Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Exhibit C - Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B - Prior Orders_Stips

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B - Prior Orders_Stips; Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A - CC 06-18-19

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A - CC 06-18-19; Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 05/03/2018; Received: 05/03/2018

ORDER - EXPARTE DATED 1/8/2018

ORDER - EXPARTE DATED 1/8/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION; Filed By: Hall, C.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Due Diligence

EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Due Diligence; Filed By: Hall, C.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Email Communication

EXHIBIT(S) - B Email Communication; Filed By: Hall, C.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Hall, C.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

AFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support

AFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Hall, C.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Exparte Order

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Exparte Order; Filed By: Hall, C.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Hall, C.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Office of John Trop; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Office of John Trop; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 10/22/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001); Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Exhibit D- Answer; Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Exhibit C - Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B - Prior Orders_Stips; Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A - CC 06-18-19; Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 05/03/2018; Received: 05/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 05/03/2018; Received: 05/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - EXPARTE DATED 1/8/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION; Filed By: Hall, C.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Due Diligence; Filed By: Hall, C.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Email Communication; Filed By: Hall, C.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Hall, C.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Hall, C.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Exparte Order; Filed By: Hall, C.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Hall, C.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less