Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 14:40:45 (UTC).

Antonio Carmine D'Alto, As Ancillary Executor of the Estate of Matilda Oved D'alto a/k/a Matilda D'Alto et al v. Thomas Disarli et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 Antonio Carmine D'Alto, As Ancillary Executor of the Estate of Matilda Oved D'alto a/k/a Matilda D'Alto filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Thomas Disarli. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

James L. Dunne, As Ancillary Administrator c.t.a of the Estate of Matilda Oved D'Alto a/k/a Matilda D'Alto

Antonio Carmine D'Alto, As Ancillary Executor of the Estate of Matilda Oved D'alto a/k/a Matilda D'Alto

Defendants

Santander Bank, N.A., Successor to Independence Savings Bank

Thomas Disarli

JP Morgan Chase Bank, Successor to the Chase Manhattan Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCDERMOTT, ROBERT G

Attorney at McDERMOTT, PIERRO, MANDERY & MANDERY, LLP

Defendant Attorney

ANSARI, IMRAN H.

Attorney at Aidala Bertuna & Kamins PC

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) 7.13.18 Letter

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) 7.13.18 Letter; Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Newspaper Article

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Newspaper Article; Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Photo of Premises

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Photo of Premises; Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) 7.25.17 Letter

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) 7.25.17 Letter; Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) CPLR 3215 Notice with AOS

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) CPLR 3215 Notice with AOS; Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

NOTICE OF REJECTION Notice of Rejection of Untimely Answer

NOTICE OF REJECTION Notice of Rejection of Untimely Answer; Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 01/25/2020; Received: 01/25/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Ansari, I.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service - Disarli

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service - Disarli; Filed By: Ansari, I.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Exhibit 1 - Summons and Verified Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Exhibit 1 - Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mcdermott, R. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mcdermott, R. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTH

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTH; Filed By: Mcdermott, R. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mcdermott, R. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) 7.13.18 Letter; Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Newspaper Article; Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Photo of Premises; Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) 7.25.17 Letter; Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) CPLR 3215 Notice with AOS; Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION Notice of Rejection of Untimely Answer; Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 01/25/2020; Received: 01/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Ansari, I.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service - Disarli; Filed By: Ansari, I.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001); Filed By: Ansari, I.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Exhibit 2 - AOS Thomas DiSarli; Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Exhibit 1 - Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mcdermott, R. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mcdermott, R. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTH; Filed By: Mcdermott, R. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mcdermott, R. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Mcdermott, R.; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less