This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 05/02/2020 at 01:49:23 (UTC).

ANTONELLA CACCIOPPOLI - v. - YOEL SALAMON et al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 ANTONELLA CACCIOPPOLI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YOEL SALAMON. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Kings County Supreme Court Civil Term located in Nassau, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antonella Caccioppoli

Defendants

Pamela Roth

Marco Vincent Parrino

Yoel Salamon

Tuvia Lukatzki

Melvin Simon

Shirly Shusterman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARON, SCOTT J

Defendant Attorneys

WEAKLAND, SHAWN MICHAEL

DEFEO, AMANDA J

SNITILY, MONICA G

WATSON, WILLIAM R.

SMITH, CHARLES G.

LEVEN, ADRIANNE JOY

MCEVOY, JOHN PHILIP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice for all Parties

STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice for all Parties; Filed By: Snitily, M.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Stipulation of Discontinuance, General Release and Hold Harmless Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Stipulation of Discontinuance, General Release and Hold Harmless Agreement; Filed By: Defeo, A.; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Order of Consolidation

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Order of Consolidation; Filed By: Defeo, A.; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Motion to Consolidate

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Motion to Consolidate; Filed By: Defeo, A.; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Verified Answers

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Verified Answers; Filed By: Defeo, A.; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Defeo, A.; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Defeo, A.; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Defeo, A.; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

ORDER - JOINT TRIAL (Motion #1) dated 12/7/18

ORDER - JOINT TRIAL (Motion #1) dated 12/7/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/17/2018; Received: 12/19/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Watson, W.; Filed: 08/08/2018; Received: 08/08/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by BAKER,MCEVOY,MORRISSEY & MOSKOVITS,P.C; Filed: 08/02/2018; Received: 08/02/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by BAKER,MCEVOY,MORRISSEY & MOSKOVITS,P.C; Filed: 08/02/2018; Received: 08/02/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Baron, S.; Filed: 07/18/2018; Received: 07/18/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Baron, S.; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Baron, S.; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Baron, S.; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Baron, S.; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Baron, S.; Filed: 06/08/2018; Received: 06/08/2018

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice for all Parties; Filed By: Snitily, M.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Stipulation of Discontinuance, General Release and Hold Harmless Agreement; Filed By: Defeo, A.; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Order of Consolidation; Filed By: Defeo, A.; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Motion to Consolidate; Filed By: Defeo, A.; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Verified Answers; Filed By: Defeo, A.; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Defeo, A.; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Defeo, A.; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Defeo, A.; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - JOINT TRIAL (Motion #1) dated 12/7/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/17/2018; Received: 12/19/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Answers in Action 2; Filed By: Defeo, A.; Filed: 10/26/2018; Received: 10/26/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Weakland, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/09/2018; Received: 08/09/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Watson, W.; Filed: 08/08/2018; Received: 08/08/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by BAKER,MCEVOY,MORRISSEY & MOSKOVITS,P.C; Filed: 08/02/2018; Received: 08/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by BAKER,MCEVOY,MORRISSEY & MOSKOVITS,P.C; Filed: 08/02/2018; Received: 08/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Baron, S.; Filed: 07/18/2018; Received: 07/18/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Baron, S.; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Baron, S.; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Baron, S.; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Baron, S.; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Baron, S.; Filed: 06/08/2018; Received: 06/08/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less