This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 03:42:31 (UTC).

Anthony Papalia v. Linwood Allentown Preservation, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/28/2019 Anthony Papalia filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Linwood Allentown Preservation, LLC. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Diane Devlin. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Diane Devlin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Papalia

Defendant

Linwood Allentown Preservation, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EARL, BOYD LEE

Attorney at LoTempio P.C. Law Group

Defendant Attorney

MCLAUGHLIN, BONNIE ANN

Attorney at COUNTY OF ERIE, DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES

 

Court Documents

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001)

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit in Reply to Plaintiff`s Response

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit in Reply to Plaintiff`s Response; Filed By: Mclaughlin, B.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Buffalo General medical records Part 4

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Buffalo General medical records Part 4; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Buffalo General medical records 8-9-18

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Buffalo General medical records 8-9-18; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Buffalo General medical records Part 3

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Buffalo General medical records Part 3; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Buffalo General medical records 8-9-18

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Buffalo General medical records 8-9-18; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Buffalo General medical records Part 2

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Buffalo General medical records Part 2; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Buffalo General medical records Part 1 8-9-18 Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Buffalo General medical records Part 1 8-9-18 Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Buffalo General medical records Part 1 Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Buffalo General medical records Part 1 Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G 12.5.18 email to HMS

EXHIBIT(S) - G 12.5.18 email to HMS; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F 12.5.18 HMS correspondence w printout

EXHIBIT(S) - F 12.5.18 HMS correspondence w printout; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E 11.30.18 email to HMS

EXHIBIT(S) - E 11.30.18 email to HMS; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D 11.30.18 HMS correspondence

EXHIBIT(S) - D 11.30.18 HMS correspondence; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C 11.29.18 email to HMS

EXHIBIT(S) - C 11.29.18 email to HMS; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B 11.20.18 HMS correspondence

EXHIBIT(S) - B 11.20.18 HMS correspondence; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A General Release

EXHIBIT(S) - A General Release; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT *Corrected*

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT *Corrected*; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

PETITION *Corrected*

PETITION *Corrected*; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit in Reply to Plaintiff`s Response; Filed By: Mclaughlin, B.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Buffalo General medical records Part 4; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Buffalo General medical records 8-9-18; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Buffalo General medical records Part 3; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Buffalo General medical records 8-9-18; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Buffalo General medical records Part 2; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Buffalo General medical records Part 1 8-9-18 Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Buffalo General medical records Part 1 Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Dr Ilozue medical records Part 5; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H 1.10.19 email to HMS; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G 12.5.18 email to HMS; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F 12.5.18 HMS correspondence w printout; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E 11.30.18 email to HMS; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D 11.30.18 HMS correspondence; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C 11.29.18 email to HMS; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B 11.20.18 HMS correspondence; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A General Release; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT *Corrected*; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION *Corrected*; Filed By: Earl, B.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less