This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:40:06 (UTC).

ANTHONY MEO - v. - LEWIS WEISS et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 ANTHONY MEO filed an Other lawsuit against LEWIS WEISS. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Meo

Defendants

Judith Weiss

Lewis Weiss

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORICI, ROBERT

Attorney at Morici & Morici, LLP

Defendant Attorney

VILLEDA, MARISA

Attorney at Law Offices of Tobias & Kuhn

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Villeda, M.; Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

ANSWER Answer and Demands

ANSWER Answer and Demands; Filed By: Villeda, M.; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Villeda, M.; Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer and Demands; Filed By: Villeda, M.; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less