This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 18:18:03 (UTC).

ANTHONY BRENNAN - v. - ROBERT A SCARETTA et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 ANTHONY BRENNAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROBERT A SCARETTA. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Brennan

Defendants

AMERICAN GOD RUSH, LLC

Robert A Scaretta

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOOTEN, PAUL J

Attorney at PAUL J HOOTEN ESQ

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) *Corrected*

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Hooten, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT)

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT); Filed By: Hooten, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

AFFIDAVIT Non Military Affidavit

AFFIDAVIT Non Military Affidavit; Filed By: Hooten, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Non Military Affidavit; Filed By: Hooten, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Hooten, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT); Filed By: Hooten, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less