Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 09:58:35 (UTC).

ANNETTE DEVITA GOLDSTEIN et al - v. - ALEXANDER GORNY M.D. et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2017 ANNETTE DEVITA GOLDSTEIN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ALEXANDER GORNY M D. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Annette Devita Goldstein Individually

Annette Devita Goldstein as Administrator of the Goods, Chattels and Credits which were of ROBERT GOLDSTEIN, deceased

Defendants

Alexander Gorny M.D.

SOUTH NASSAU COMMUNITIES HOSPITAL

Rafael Sezan M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GROSS, KEITH HUGH

Defendant Attorneys

DYCKMAN, DEBORAH A

Attorney at BARTLETT LLP

KLEIN, MICHAEL DAVID

Attorney at Bartlett LLP

SCHNEIDER, WILLIAM SCOTT

Attorney at BARTLETT LLP

BARBIERO, ANTHONY FRANCIS

Attorney at BARTLETT LLP

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) LETTER TO COURT RE WITHDRAWAL OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION AS TO DR. GORNY

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) LETTER TO COURT RE WITHDRAWAL OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION AS TO DR. GORNY; Filed By: Klein, M.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE AS TO ALEXANDER GORNY MD

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE AS TO ALEXANDER GORNY MD; Filed By: Klein, M.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001) STIPULATION TO ADJOURN MOTION

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001) STIPULATION TO ADJOURN MOTION; Filed By: Klein, M.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S)

Continued EBT Transcript of Rafael Sezan, M.D.

EXHIBIT(S)

EBT Transcript of Rafael Sezan, M.D.

EXHIBIT(S)

Continued EBT Transcript of Alexander Gorny, M.D.

EXHIBIT(S)

EBT Transcript of Alexander Gorny, M.D.

EXHIBIT(S)

EBT Transcript of Annette Devita Goldstein

EXHIBIT(S)

Initial Expert Witness Disclosure

EXHIBIT(S)

Pleadings

EXHIBIT(S)

Notice of Medical Exchange

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

--none--

ANSWER

VERIFIED ANSWER AND COMBINED DEMAND OBO ALL DEFS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) LETTER TO COURT RE WITHDRAWAL OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION AS TO DR. GORNY; Filed By: Klein, M.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE AS TO ALEXANDER GORNY MD; Filed By: Klein, M.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001) STIPULATION TO ADJOURN MOTION; Filed By: Klein, M.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Dyckman, D.; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #001) Continued EBT Transcript of Rafael Sezan, M.D.; Filed By: Dyckman, D.; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #001) EBT Transcript of Rafael Sezan, M.D.; Filed By: Dyckman, D.; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #001) Continued EBT Transcript of Alexander Gorny, M.D.; Filed By: Dyckman, D.; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) EBT Transcript of Alexander Gorny, M.D.; Filed By: Dyckman, D.; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) EBT Transcript of Annette Devita Goldstein; Filed By: Dyckman, D.; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) South Nassau Communities Hospital Records Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Dyckman, D.; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Gross, K.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Initial Expert Witness Disclosure; Filed By: Gross, K.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Pleadings; Filed By: Gross, K.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Medical Exchange Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Gross, K.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Gross, K.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER AND COMBINED DEMAND OBO ALL DEFS; Filed By: Barbiero, A.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gross, K.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gross, K.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gross, K.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Gross, K.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less