This case was last updated from Tompkins County Courts on 06/25/2020 at 21:32:26 (UTC).

Anne C. Soos et al - v. - Kyle VanDerpoel et al

Case Summary

On 03/23/2017 Anne C Soos filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kyle VanDerpoel. This case was filed in Tompkins County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Gerald A Keene. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0051

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Tompkins, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Gerald A Keene

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anne C. Soos

Thomas H. Canfield

Defendants

Kyle Vanderpoel

Certified Properties of Tompkins County, Inc.

Alaina Mancini

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CROSSMORE, EDWARD Y

Attorney at EDWARD Y CROSSMORE ESQ

MELENDEZ, ANDREW PETER

Attorney at The Crossmore Law Office

Defendant Attorney

WALKER, JEFFREY DANIEL

Attorney at SCHLATHER, STUMBAR, PARKS & SALK, LLP

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 12/05/2019

MOTION (UPDATED RETURN DATE)

MOTION (UPDATED RETURN DATE); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #3)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #3); Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Subpoena Duces Tecum

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Subpoena Duces Tecum; Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3); Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

TRIAL / HEARING MINUTES

TRIAL / HEARING MINUTES; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A COMPLETE MANAGEMENT AGREEMENT

EXHIBIT(S) - A COMPLETE MANAGEMENT AGREEMENT; Filed By: Walker, J.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Verified Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Verified Complaint; Filed By: Crossmore, E.; Filed: 01/19/2018; Received: 01/19/2018

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Edward Y. Crossmore, Esq. in support of Order of Severance

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Edward Y. Crossmore, Esq. in support of Order of Severance; Filed By: Crossmore, E.; Filed: 01/19/2018; Received: 01/19/2018

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Order of Severance

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Order of Severance; Filed By: Crossmore, E.; Filed: 01/19/2018; Received: 01/19/2018

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Crossmore, E.; Filed: 05/08/2017; Received: 05/08/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Copy of Management Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - A Copy of Management Agreement; Filed By: Walker, J.; Filed: 04/21/2017; Received: 04/21/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Walker, J.; Filed: 04/21/2017; Received: 04/21/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Kyle VanDerpoel

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Kyle VanDerpoel; Filed By: Crossmore, E.; Filed: 04/17/2017; Received: 04/17/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Certified Properties of Tompkins County, Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Certified Properties of Tompkins County, Inc.; Filed By: Crossmore, E.; Filed: 04/17/2017; Received: 04/17/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Crossmore, E.; Filed: 03/23/2017; Received: 03/23/2017

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 12/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION (UPDATED RETURN DATE); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #3); Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Subpoena Duces Tecum; Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #3); Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Crossmore, E. - filed by Wilkinson, K.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRIAL / HEARING MINUTES; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A COMPLETE MANAGEMENT AGREEMENT; Filed By: Walker, J.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (AMENDED); Filed By: Walker, J.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavit of Service (Vanderpoel); Filed By: Crossmore, E.; Filed: 01/19/2018; Received: 01/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Verified Complaint; Filed By: Crossmore, E.; Filed: 01/19/2018; Received: 01/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Edward Y. Crossmore, Esq. in support of Order of Severance; Filed By: Crossmore, E.; Filed: 01/19/2018; Received: 01/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Order of Severance; Filed By: Crossmore, E.; Filed: 01/19/2018; Received: 01/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Crossmore, E.; Filed: 05/08/2017; Received: 05/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Copy of Management Agreement; Filed By: Walker, J.; Filed: 04/21/2017; Received: 04/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Walker, J.; Filed: 04/21/2017; Received: 04/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Kyle VanDerpoel; Filed By: Crossmore, E.; Filed: 04/17/2017; Received: 04/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Certified Properties of Tompkins County, Inc.; Filed By: Crossmore, E.; Filed: 04/17/2017; Received: 04/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Crossmore, E.; Filed: 03/23/2017; Received: 03/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less