This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 08:38:17 (UTC).

Anita R. Gupta - v. - Young Men's Christian Association of Greater New York

Case Summary

On 06/21/2017 Anita R Gupta filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Young Men's Christian Association of Greater New York. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise Sher. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Denise Sher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anita R. Gupta

Defendant

Young Men's Christian Association of Greater New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLEERE, THOMAS P.

Attorney at CELLINO AND BARNES

Defendant Attorneys

KLAUBER, ANDREW L

Attorney at MALAPERO PRISCO & KLAUBER LLP

CUNNINGHAM, WILLIAM BRIGGS

Attorney at MALAPERO PRISCO & KLAUBER LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

Stipulation of Discntinuance

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

Notice of Change of Address and Firm Name

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

COURT NOTICE

Corrected PC Date

COURT NOTICE

--none--

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

ORDER WITH NOE

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

--none--

COURT NOTICE

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

VERIFIED ANSWER

EXHIBIT(S)

SUMM AND COMP

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT

--none--

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

ANSWER (AMENDED)

Verified Amended Answer to Complaint - Served concurrently with Demand to Change Place of Trial

DEMAND FOR CHANGE OF PLACE OF TRIAL

From County of Queens to County of Nassau - Amended Answer being filed concurrently.

ANSWER

Verified Answer to Complaint

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discntinuance; Filed By: Klauber, A.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Notice of Change of Address and Firm Name; Filed By: Klauber, A.; Filed: 10/29/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/26/2018; Received: 09/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE Corrected PC Date; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Klauber, A.; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A ORDER WITH NOE; Filed By: Klauber, A.; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Klauber, A.; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/26/2018; Received: 07/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY CLERK CERTIFICATION OF MINUTES; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/25/2018; Received: 07/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001QN) AMENDED ANSWER; Filed By: Klauber, A.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001QN) VERIFIED ANSWER; Filed By: Klauber, A.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001QN) SUMM AND COMP; Filed By: Klauber, A.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001QN); Filed By: Klauber, A.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001QN) *Corrected*; Filed By: Klauber, A.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (AMENDED) Verified Amended Answer to Complaint - Served concurrently with Demand to Change Place of Trial; Filed By: Klauber, A.; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR CHANGE OF PLACE OF TRIAL From County of Queens to County of Nassau - Amended Answer being filed concurrently.; Filed By: Klauber, A.; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer to Complaint; Filed By: Klauber, A.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cleere, T.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cleere, T.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less