This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 01:08:42 (UTC).

ANGELITA KOELB v. NEW YORK COMMUNITY BANK et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 ANGELITA KOELB filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NEW YORK COMMUNITY BANK. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Kim Dollard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Kim Dollard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angelita Koelb

Defendants

NEW YORK COMMUNITY BANK

VRW 1 LLC

STERLING I LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINDER, MARK

Attorney at HARMON, LINDER & ROGOWSKY, ESQS.

Defendant Attorneys

KING, THOMAS JOSEPH

Attorney at CORREIA, KING, FODERA, McGINNIS & LIFERIEDGE

SMITH, RACHEL MARIE

Attorney at CAMACHO MAURO MULHOLLAND LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) signed order

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) signed order; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: King, T.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference, Affirmation and Affidavit of Service

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference, Affirmation and Affidavit of Service; Filed By: King, T.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer to Cross-Claims

ANSWER Verified Answer to Cross-Claims; Filed By: Smith, R.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Verified Answer with Cross-Claims and Discovery Demands

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Verified Answer with Cross-Claims and Discovery Demands; Filed By: King, T.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross-Claims and Discovery Demands

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross-Claims and Discovery Demands; Filed By: King, T.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) signed order; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: King, T.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference, Affirmation and Affidavit of Service; Filed By: King, T.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer to Cross-Claims; Filed By: Smith, R.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Combined Demands; Filed By: Smith, R.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Verified Answer with Cross-Claims and Discovery Demands; Filed By: King, T.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross-Claims and Discovery Demands; Filed By: King, T.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less