This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 02/19/2023 at 03:21:54 (UTC).

ANGELA DORIO-MINOTTI v. SHOP-RITE SUPERMARKETS, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 ANGELA DORIO-MINOTTI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SHOP-RITE SUPERMARKETS, INC. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Putnam, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Gina C Capone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2022

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Gina C Capone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angela Dorio-minotti

Defendant

SHOP-RITE SUPERMARKETS, INC. DBA SHOPRITE #235 CARMEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DELGADO, GAMALIEL BENJAMIN

Defendant Attorney

CURCIO, CRAIG P

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Delgado, G.; Filed: 11/10/2022; Received: 11/10/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SHOP-RITE SUPERMARKETS, INC. d/b/a Shoprite #235 Carmel

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SHOP-RITE SUPERMARKETS, INC. d/b/a Shoprite #235 Carmel; Filed By: Delgado, G. - filed by Executive Attorney Service, Inc.; Filed: 11/16/2022; Received: 11/16/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Delgado, G. - filed by Executive Attorney Service, Inc.; Filed: 11/16/2022; Received: 11/16/2022

ANSWER Verified Answer together with Attorney Verification

ANSWER Verified Answer together with Attorney Verification; Filed By: Curcio, C.; Filed: 12/08/2022; Received: 12/08/2022

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Curcio, C.; Filed: 12/08/2022; Received: 12/08/2022

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference with Affirmation of Good Faith

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference with Affirmation of Good Faith; Filed By: Delgado, G.; Filed: 02/16/2023; Received: 02/16/2023

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Delgado, G.; Filed: 02/16/2023; Received: 02/16/2023

 

Docket Entries

02/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Delgado, G.; Filed: 02/16/2023; Received: 02/16/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference with Affirmation of Good Faith; Filed By: Delgado, G.; Filed: 02/16/2023; Received: 02/16/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Curcio, C.; Filed: 12/08/2022; Received: 12/08/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER Verified Answer together with Attorney Verification; Filed By: Curcio, C.; Filed: 12/08/2022; Received: 12/08/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Delgado, G. - filed by Executive Attorney Service, Inc.; Filed: 11/16/2022; Received: 11/16/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SHOP-RITE SUPERMARKETS, INC. d/b/a Shoprite #235 Carmel; Filed By: Delgado, G. - filed by Executive Attorney Service, Inc.; Filed: 11/16/2022; Received: 11/16/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Delgado, G.; Filed: 11/10/2022; Received: 11/10/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less