This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 18:19:06 (UTC).

ANGEL G. CRUZ - v. - THE CITY OF NEW YORK et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 ANGEL G CRUZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE CITY OF NEW YORK. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******017E

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angel G. Cruz

Defendants

THE CITY OF NEW YORK

NEW YORK CITY HOUSING AUTHORITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HARRIS, SETH A

Attorney at Burns & Harris

KEENAN, ALISON ROSE

Attorney at BURNS & HARRIS

Defendant Attorneys

AHLBERG, BLAKE N

Attorney at NYC Law Department

Counsel, Corporation

Attorney at New York City Corporation Counsel

SIFF, DANIEL E

Attorney at LEDY-GURREN BASS & SIFF, LLP

GURFINKEL, STEPHEN JACOB

Attorney at NYCHA Law Department

 

Court Documents

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 02/03/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 02/03/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002)

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002); Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) EXHIBIT F - PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) EXHIBIT F - PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) EXHIBIT E - ANSWER (NYCHA)

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) EXHIBIT E - ANSWER (NYCHA); Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) EXHIBIT D - ANSWER (CNY)

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) EXHIBIT D - ANSWER (CNY); Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) EXHIBIT C - S&C AND AOS

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) EXHIBIT C - S&C AND AOS; Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) EXHIBIT B - 50 H TRANSCRIPT

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) EXHIBIT B - 50 H TRANSCRIPT; Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) EXHIBIT A - NOC &AOS

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) EXHIBIT A - NOC &AOS Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/21/2018

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Gurfinkel, S.; Filed: 02/21/2018; Received: 02/21/2018

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Gurfinkel, S.; Filed: 02/21/2018; Received: 02/21/2018

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Gurfinkel, S.; Filed: 02/21/2018; Received: 02/21/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Siff, D.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Keenan, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Keenan, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Keenan, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 02/03/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002); Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) EXHIBIT F - PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) EXHIBIT E - ANSWER (NYCHA); Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) EXHIBIT D - ANSWER (CNY); Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) EXHIBIT C - S&C AND AOS; Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) EXHIBIT B - 50 H TRANSCRIPT; Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) EXHIBIT A - NOC &AOS Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 08/14/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Gurfinkel, S.; Filed: 02/21/2018; Received: 02/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Gurfinkel, S.; Filed: 02/21/2018; Received: 02/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Gurfinkel, S.; Filed: 02/21/2018; Received: 02/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Siff, D.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Keenan, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Keenan, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Keenan, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Harris, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less