This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 05/21/2020 at 23:26:01 (UTC).

ANDREW YAP v. NEPTUNE SOUTH COMMERCIAL, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/27/2018 ANDREW YAP filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against NEPTUNE SOUTH COMMERCIAL, LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Peter Paul Sweeney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Peter Paul Sweeney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrew Yap

Defendants

TRM CONTRACTING 626, LLC

NEPTUNE SOUTH COMMERCIAL, LLC

TRM CONTRACTING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOODSTEIN, MATTHEW DEMARS

Attorney at Pollack, Pollack, Isaac & De Cicco

Defendant Attorneys

LEEST, MICHAEL L

Attorney at Hannum Feretic Prendergast & Merlino LLC

BERNSTEIN, MEREDITH L.

Attorney at Hannum Feretic Prendergast & Merlino, LLC

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Bernstein, M.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - I Exhibit I - Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - I Exhibit I - Agreement; Filed By: Bernstein, M.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - H Exhibit H - Accident Report

EXHIBIT(S) - H Exhibit H - Accident Report; Filed By: Bernstein, M.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - G Exhibit G - Defendant's Exhibits

EXHIBIT(S) - G Exhibit G - Defendant's Exhibits; Filed By: Bernstein, M.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F - Photograph of Plywood

EXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F - Photograph of Plywood; Filed By: Bernstein, M.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E - Mr. Sammarco's Deposition Transcript

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E - Mr. Sammarco's Deposition Transcript; Filed By: Bernstein, M.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript; Filed By: Bernstein, M.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C - Verified Bill of Particulars

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C - Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Bernstein, M.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Defendant's Answers

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Defendant's Answers; Filed By: Bernstein, M.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

DEMAND FOR: Demand Pursuant to Mandatory Insurer Reporting Law 111 of Public Law 110-173

DEMAND FOR: Demand Pursuant to Mandatory Insurer Reporting Law 111 of Public Law 110-173; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

DEMAND FOR: Demand Pursuant to CPLR 4545

DEMAND FOR: Demand Pursuant to CPLR 4545; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice for Discovery and Inspection

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice for Discovery and Inspection; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

ANSWER Answer to Verified Complaint

ANSWER Answer to Verified Complaint; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TRM Contracting 626 LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TRM Contracting 626 LLC; Filed By: Goodstein, M.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TRM Contracting LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TRM Contracting LLC; Filed By: Goodstein, M.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Neptune South Commercial

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Neptune South Commercial; Filed By: Goodstein, M.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Goodstein, M.; Filed: 12/27/2018; Received: 12/27/2018

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Bernstein, M.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I Exhibit I - Agreement; Filed By: Bernstein, M.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H Exhibit H - Accident Report; Filed By: Bernstein, M.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G Exhibit G - Defendant's Exhibits; Filed By: Bernstein, M.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F - Photograph of Plywood; Filed By: Bernstein, M.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E - Mr. Sammarco's Deposition Transcript; Filed By: Bernstein, M.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript; Filed By: Bernstein, M.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C - Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Bernstein, M.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Defendant's Answers; Filed By: Bernstein, M.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Bernstein, M.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Ad Damnum; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand Pursuant to Mandatory Insurer Reporting Law 111 of Public Law 110-173; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand Pursuant to CPLR 4545; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice for Discovery and Inspection; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to Verified Complaint; Filed By: Leest, M.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TRM Contracting 626 LLC; Filed By: Goodstein, M.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TRM Contracting LLC; Filed By: Goodstein, M.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Neptune South Commercial; Filed By: Goodstein, M.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Goodstein, M.; Filed: 12/27/2018; Received: 12/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less