Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 15:03:36 (UTC).

ANDREW LUBRANO v. METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 ANDREW LUBRANO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Levine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Levine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrew Lubrano

Defendants

MTA CAPITAL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT AUTHORITY

WSP USA INC.

METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

RAILWORKS TRANSIT, INC.

RAILWORKS COPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAWLOR, RYAN J

Attorney at Wingate, Russotti, Shapiro & Halperin

Defendant Attorneys

RAPISARDI, DANIELA ANNA

Attorney at New York City Law Department

CAROTENUTO, LOUIS A

Attorney at CARTAFALSA, TURPIN & LENOFF

DEMOTT, RENEE EDYTHE

Attorney at Cartafalsa Turpin & Lenoff

LOCKE, GREGORY ALLEN

Attorney at Brewer, Attorneys and Counselors

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Stipulation Withdrawing Motion

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Stipulation Withdrawing Motion; Filed By: Lawlor, R.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Good Faith Letter

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Good Faith Letter; Filed By: Demott, R.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) PC Order

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) PC Order; Filed By: Demott, R.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Pleadings

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Pleadings; Filed By: Demott, R.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #1) Good Faith Affirmation

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #1) Good Faith Affirmation; Filed By: Demott, R.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation; Filed By: Demott, R.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Defendant WSP USA INC.'s Notice of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Defendant WSP USA INC.'s Notice of Motion; Filed By: Demott, R.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Order Dated 09/09/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Order Dated 09/09/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on WSP USA Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on WSP USA Inc.; Filed By: Lawlor, R.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Rapisardi, D.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

AFFIDAVIT Lubrano aos BY ECF AND BY MAIL

AFFIDAVIT Lubrano aos BY ECF AND BY MAIL; Filed By: Locke, G.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Lubrano Verified Answer with Cross-Claims

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Lubrano Verified Answer with Cross-Claims; Filed By: Locke, G.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Defendant WSP USA INC.'s Verified Answer with Cross-Claims and Various Discovery Demands

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Defendant WSP USA INC.'s Verified Answer with Cross-Claims and Various Discovery Demands; Filed By: Carotenuto, L.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lawlor, R.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lawlor, R.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lawlor, R.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lawlor, R.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Lawlor, R.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Stipulation Withdrawing Motion; Filed By: Lawlor, R.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Good Faith Letter; Filed By: Demott, R.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) PC Order; Filed By: Demott, R.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Pleadings; Filed By: Demott, R.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #1) Good Faith Affirmation; Filed By: Demott, R.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation; Filed By: Demott, R.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Defendant WSP USA INC.'s Notice of Motion; Filed By: Demott, R.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Order Dated 09/09/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on WSP USA Inc.; Filed By: Lawlor, R.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Railworks Transit, Inc.; Filed By: Lawlor, R.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Defendant WSP USA INC.'s Request for Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Carotenuto, L.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Rapisardi, D.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Lubrano aos BY ECF AND BY MAIL; Filed By: Locke, G.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Lubrano Verified Answer with Cross-Claims; Filed By: Locke, G.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Defendant WSP USA INC.'s Verified Answer with Cross-Claims and Various Discovery Demands; Filed By: Carotenuto, L.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lawlor, R.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lawlor, R.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lawlor, R.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lawlor, R.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Lawlor, R.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less