This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:10:25 (UTC).

Ana Lopez - v. - City of New York et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Ana Lopez filed an Other lawsuit against City of New York. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ana Lopez

Defendants

Department of Transportation

City of New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLANCY, DONNA H.

Attorney at The Clancy Law Firm

Defendant Attorney

Counsel, Corporation

Attorney at New York City Corporation Counsel

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS Summons

SUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Clancy, D.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Clancy, D.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Clancy, D.; Filed: 10/29/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

COMPLAINT Complaint

COMPLAINT Complaint; Filed By: Clancy, D.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 040/1/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 040/1/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 040/1/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Clancy, D.; Filed: 10/29/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Clancy, D.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Complaint; Filed By: Clancy, D.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Clancy, D.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less