Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 18:08:32 (UTC).

Amy Kessel - v. - April Adams et al

Case Summary

On 04/24/2017 Amy Kessel filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against April Adams. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amy Kessel

Defendants

Margaret Rennells

April Adams

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIXON, MICHAEL

Attorney at Nash Connors PC

Defendant Attorneys

RENDA, KATIE LYNN

Attorney at Chelus, Herdzik, Speyer & Monte, P.C.

ADOFF, AARON MORRIS

Attorney at Kenney Sheton Liptak Nowak LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Service Notice of Appeal

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affirmation of Service Notice of Appeal

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Service Notice of Entry

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Service Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF APPEAL

--none--

NOTICE OF APPEAL

--none--

NOTICE OF ENTRY

--none--

NOTICE OF ENTRY

--none--

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

DVBOP

EXHIBIT(S)

Complaint

AFFIRMATION

--none--

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

--none--

ANSWER

Answer

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Service

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

Summons and Complaint

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004) Affidavit of Service Notice of Appeal; Filed By: Adoff, A.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #005) Affirmation of Service Notice of Appeal; Filed By: Adoff, A.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004) Affidavit of Service Notice of Entry; Filed By: Adoff, A.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #005) Affidavit of Service Notice of Entry; Filed By: Adoff, A.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #004); Filed By: Adoff, A.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #005); Filed By: Adoff, A.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #004); Filed By: Adoff, A.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #005); Filed By: Adoff, A.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #005); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #004); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) ODD; Filed By: Renda, K.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) DVBOP; Filed By: Renda, K.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Complaint; Filed By: Renda, K.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #001); Filed By: Renda, K.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Renda, K.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Adoff, A.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer; Filed By: Renda, K.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Dixon, M.; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Dixon, M.; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Dixon, M.; Filed: 04/24/2017; Received: 04/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less