This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 15:12:33 (UTC).

Ampere Business Services, Inc. - v. - Christopher R. Mayor

Case Summary

On 06/12/2017 Ampere Business Services, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Christopher R Mayor. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ampere Business Services, Inc. dba Indoor Billboard Network - North Shore

Defendant

Christopher R. Mayor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENBERG, E. H

Attorney at E. HOPE GREENBERG

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Greenberg, E.; Filed: 04/10/2018; Received: 04/10/2018

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/28/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Greenberg, E.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Greenberg, E.; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Greenberg, E.; Filed: 01/26/2018; Received: 01/26/2018

ORDER - OTHER Order for Mot Seq #1 (S/J mot)

ORDER - OTHER Order for Mot Seq #1 (S/J mot); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/12/2018; Received: 01/12/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Greenberg, E.; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Greenberg, E.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Demand Letter

EXHIBIT(S) - B Demand Letter; Filed By: Greenberg, E.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Promissory Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Promissory Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Greenberg, E.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

MEMORANDUM OF LAW

MEMORANDUM OF LAW; Filed By: Greenberg, E.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Greenberg, E.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

SUMMONS AND 3213 MOTION W/ RJI

SUMMONS AND 3213 MOTION W/ RJI; Filed By: Greenberg, E.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Greenberg, E.; Filed: 04/10/2018; Received: 04/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Greenberg, E.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/28/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Greenberg, E.; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Greenberg, E.; Filed: 01/26/2018; Received: 01/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Order for Mot Seq #1 (S/J mot); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/12/2018; Received: 01/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Greenberg, E.; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Greenberg, E.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Demand Letter; Filed By: Greenberg, E.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Promissory Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Greenberg, E.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW; Filed By: Greenberg, E.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Greenberg, E.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS AND 3213 MOTION W/ RJI; Filed By: Greenberg, E.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less