Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 20:17:29 (UTC).

AmeriCU Credit Union v. Teisha M Irizarry

Case Summary

On 01/26/2019 AmeriCU Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Teisha M Irizarry. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0215

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AmeriCU Credit Union

Defendant

Teisha M Irizarry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RASMUSSEN, DAVID LEE

Attorney at Davidson Fink, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

AFFIDAVIT MILITARY

AFFIDAVIT MILITARY; Filed By: Rasmussen, D.; Filed: 05/12/2019; Received: 05/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ADD MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ADD MAILING; Filed By: Rasmussen, D.; Filed: 05/12/2019; Received: 05/12/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Rasmussen, D.; Filed: 05/12/2019; Received: 05/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rasmussen, D.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - AB Exhibits

EXHIBIT(S) - AB Exhibits; Filed By: Rasmussen, D.; Filed: 01/26/2019; Received: 01/26/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SC

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SC; Filed By: Rasmussen, D.; Filed: 01/26/2019; Received: 01/26/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT MILITARY; Filed By: Rasmussen, D.; Filed: 05/12/2019; Received: 05/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ADD MAILING; Filed By: Rasmussen, D.; Filed: 05/12/2019; Received: 05/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Rasmussen, D.; Filed: 05/12/2019; Received: 05/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rasmussen, D.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - AB Exhibits; Filed By: Rasmussen, D.; Filed: 01/26/2019; Received: 01/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SC; Filed By: Rasmussen, D.; Filed: 01/26/2019; Received: 01/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less