This case was last updated from Madison County New York Courts on 09/24/2021 at 14:37:59 (UTC).

AMERICU CREDIT UNION v. MICHAEL D. BURCH

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 AMERICU CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL D BURCH. This case was filed in Madison County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald F Cerio. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1681

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Madison, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Donald F Cerio

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICU CREDIT UNION

Defendant

Michael D. Burch

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RADEL, PATRICK GERARD

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS Plaintiff's Summons

SUMMONS Plaintiff's Summons; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/03/2021; Received: 08/03/2021

COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Verified Complaint

COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Verified Complaint; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/03/2021; Received: 08/03/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Loan Dated 9/28/15

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Loan Dated 9/28/15; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/03/2021; Received: 08/03/2021

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraining Notice

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraining Notice; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/03/2021; Received: 08/03/2021

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Patrick G. Radel, Esq., in support of motion for order of seizure and temporary restraining order

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Patrick G. Radel, Esq., in support of motion for order of seizure and temporary restraining order; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/03/2021; Received: 08/03/2021

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Francis M. Liuzzi in support of motion for order of seizure and temporary restraining order

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Francis M. Liuzzi in support of motion for order of seizure and temporary restraining order; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/03/2021; Received: 08/03/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Exhibit 1 - Copy Plaintiff's Summons and Verified Complaint with supporting exhibit

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Exhibit 1 - Copy Plaintiff's Summons and Verified Complaint with supporting exhibit; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/03/2021; Received: 08/03/2021

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/03/2021; Received: 08/03/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/04/2021; Received: 08/04/2021

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #001)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/11/2021; Received: 08/11/2021

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of Plaintiff's Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraining Notice and Supporting Documents; and Summons and Complaint with E-FIling Notice on Defendant

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of Plaintiff's Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraining Notice and Supporting Documents; and Summons and Complaint with E-FIling Notice on Defendant; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/23/2021; Received: 08/23/2021

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing Via First Class Mail of Bare Summons on Defendant

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing Via First Class Mail of Bare Summons on Defendant; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/23/2021; Received: 08/23/2021

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Letter to Judge Cerio withdrawing Plaintiff's Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraining Order scheduled for 8/25/21

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Letter to Judge Cerio withdrawing Plaintiff's Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraining Order scheduled for 8/25/21; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/27/2021; Received: 08/30/2021

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Hon. Donald F. Cerio, Jr., A.J.S.C. from Plaintiff's Counsel, Patrick G. Radel, Esq.

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Hon. Donald F. Cerio, Jr., A.J.S.C. from Plaintiff's Counsel, Patrick G. Radel, Esq.; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 09/01/2021; Received: 09/01/2021

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Hon. Donald F. Cerio, Jr., A.J.S.C. from Plaintiff's Counsel, Patrick G. Radel, Esq.; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 09/01/2021; Received: 09/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/27/2021; Received: 08/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Letter to Judge Cerio withdrawing Plaintiff's Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraining Order scheduled for 8/25/21; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing Via First Class Mail of Bare Summons on Defendant; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/23/2021; Received: 08/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of Plaintiff's Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraining Notice and Supporting Documents; and Summons and Complaint with E-FIling Notice on Defendant; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/23/2021; Received: 08/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/11/2021; Received: 08/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/04/2021; Received: 08/04/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/03/2021; Received: 08/03/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Exhibit 1 - Copy Plaintiff's Summons and Verified Complaint with supporting exhibit; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/03/2021; Received: 08/03/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Francis M. Liuzzi in support of motion for order of seizure and temporary restraining order; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/03/2021; Received: 08/03/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation of Patrick G. Radel, Esq., in support of motion for order of seizure and temporary restraining order; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/03/2021; Received: 08/03/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraining Notice; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/03/2021; Received: 08/03/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Loan Dated 9/28/15; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/03/2021; Received: 08/03/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Plaintiff's Verified Complaint; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/03/2021; Received: 08/03/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS Plaintiff's Summons; Filed By: Radel, P.; Filed: 08/03/2021; Received: 08/03/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less