This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 02/25/2023 at 13:43:12 (UTC).

Americu Credit Union v. Julie A. Mueller et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 Americu Credit Union filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Julie A Mueller. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Greene, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph E Lamendola. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2022

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Joseph E Lamendola

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Americu Credit Union

Defendants

Julie A. Mueller

John Doe

Mary Roe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SANDA, GREGORY JAMES

ZORNEK, ANNA MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for SRJI

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for SRJI; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/10/2023; Received: 02/10/2023

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/07/2023; Received: 02/07/2023

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/07/2023; Received: 02/07/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT MAILING; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 02/01/2023; Received: 02/01/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE NAME UNKNOWN SHA JOHN DOE #1 MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE NAME UNKNOWN SHA JOHN DOE #1 MAILING; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 02/01/2023; Received: 02/01/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE NAME UNKNOWN SHA JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE NAME UNKNOWN SHA JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 02/01/2023; Received: 02/01/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JULIE A. MUELLER DMDC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JULIE A. MUELLER DMDC; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 02/01/2023; Received: 02/01/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JULIE A. MUELLER 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JULIE A. MUELLER 3215; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 02/01/2023; Received: 02/01/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JULIE A. MUELLER

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JULIE A. MUELLER; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 02/01/2023; Received: 02/01/2023

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/19/2022; Received: 12/19/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - F 90 Days

EXHIBIT(S) - F 90 Days; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/19/2022; Received: 12/19/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - E forbearance

EXHIBIT(S) - E forbearance; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/19/2022; Received: 12/19/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - D Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - D Mortgage; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/19/2022; Received: 12/19/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - C note

EXHIBIT(S) - C note; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/19/2022; Received: 12/19/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - B Lienholders

EXHIBIT(S) - B Lienholders; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/19/2022; Received: 12/19/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - A Parties

EXHIBIT(S) - A Parties; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/19/2022; Received: 12/19/2022

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/19/2022; Received: 12/19/2022

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/19/2022; Received: 12/19/2022

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for SRJI; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/10/2023; Received: 02/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/07/2023; Received: 02/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/07/2023; Received: 02/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT MAILING; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 02/01/2023; Received: 02/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE NAME UNKNOWN SHA JOHN DOE #1 MAILING; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 02/01/2023; Received: 02/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE NAME UNKNOWN SHA JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 02/01/2023; Received: 02/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JULIE A. MUELLER DMDC; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 02/01/2023; Received: 02/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JULIE A. MUELLER 3215; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 02/01/2023; Received: 02/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JULIE A. MUELLER; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 02/01/2023; Received: 02/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 01/31/2023; Received: 01/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/19/2022; Received: 12/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/19/2022; Received: 12/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F 90 Days; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/19/2022; Received: 12/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E forbearance; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/19/2022; Received: 12/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Mortgage; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/19/2022; Received: 12/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C note; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/19/2022; Received: 12/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Lienholders; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/19/2022; Received: 12/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Parties; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/19/2022; Received: 12/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/19/2022; Received: 12/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/19/2022; Received: 12/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less