This case was last updated from Cortland County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 12:54:46 (UTC).

AmeriCU Credit Union v. Donald E Pendell et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 AmeriCU Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Donald E Pendell. This case was filed in Cortland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Ferris D. Lebous. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****-392

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Cortland, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Ferris D. Lebous

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AmeriCU Credit Union

Defendants

Donald E Pendell

Marc C Pendell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAW, AMANDA C

Attorney at Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Attorney Affidavits

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Attorney Affidavits; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing - Marc Pendell

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing - Marc Pendell; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing - Donald Pendell

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing - Donald Pendell; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Marc Pendell

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Marc Pendell; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice of Commencement

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice of Commencement; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer and Shaw, LLC; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer and Shaw, LLC; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer and Shaw, LLC; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Attorney Affidavits; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing - Marc Pendell; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing - Donald Pendell; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Marc Pendell; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice of Commencement; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer and Shaw, LLC; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer and Shaw, LLC; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer and Shaw, LLC; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less