This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 10/13/2021 at 09:52:02 (UTC).

AMERICAN TRANSIT INSURANCE COMPANY v. SURGICORE OF JERSEY CITY, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 AMERICAN TRANSIT INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against SURGICORE OF JERSEY CITY, LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN TRANSIT INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

SURGICORE OF JERSEY CITY, LLC A/A/O NORMA FIGUEROA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LARKIN, WILLIAM ROBERT

Attorney at Larkin Farrell, LLC

Defendant Attorney

GOTTLIEB, DAVID M.

Attorney at Samandarov & Associates

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/18/2021; Received: 08/18/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/18/2021; Received: 08/18/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Larkin Farrell LLC; Filed: 08/11/2021; Received: 08/11/2021

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Larkin Farrell LLC; Filed: 08/11/2021; Received: 08/11/2021

DEMAND FOR: Discovery

DEMAND FOR: Discovery; Filed By: Gottlieb, D.; Filed: 08/09/2021; Received: 08/09/2021

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Gottlieb, D.; Filed: 08/09/2021; Received: 08/09/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/18/2021; Received: 08/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/18/2021; Received: 08/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Larkin Farrell LLC; Filed: 08/11/2021; Received: 08/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Larkin Farrell LLC; Filed: 08/11/2021; Received: 08/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Discovery; Filed By: Gottlieb, D.; Filed: 08/09/2021; Received: 08/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Gottlieb, D.; Filed: 08/09/2021; Received: 08/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less