This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 17:51:02 (UTC).

AMERICAN TRANSIT INSURANCE COMPANY v. MAURICE YOUNG et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 AMERICAN TRANSIT INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MAURICE YOUNG. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN TRANSIT INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

Maurice Young

AK GLOBAL SUPPLY CORP

ZU RIVER ACUPUNCTURE PC

ALNADA PHYSICAL THERAPY PC

HEALTHWISE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES PC

MCDONALD AVE CHIROPRACTIC PC

COMFORT PHYSICAL THERAPY PLLC

COLUMBUS IMAGING CENTER LLC

MOUNT SINAI MEDICAL SUPPLY INC

ANTHONY P. SIANO JR DC

APS CHIROPRACTIC SERVICES PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LARKIN, WILLIAM ROBERT

Attorney at Larkin Farrell, LLC

COHEN, STEVEN B.

Attorney at Law Offices of Steven Balson-Cohen, Esq

Defendant Attorneys

LANDFAIR, DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at KOPELEVICH & FELDSHEROVA PC

PADRUCCO, JOSEPH J.

Attorney at Gabriel & Shapiro LLC

GOLDMAN, ANNA

Attorney at Law Offices of Anna Goldman

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance to APS Chiropractic and Dr. Anthony Siano

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance to APS Chiropractic and Dr. Anthony Siano; Filed By: Cohen, S.; Filed: 03/18/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

ANSWER Answer for Zu River Acupunture PC

ANSWER Answer for Zu River Acupunture PC; Filed By: Padrucco, J.; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Cohen, S.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

DEMAND FOR:

DEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Landfair, D.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Landfair, D.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Cohen, S.; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Goldman, A.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTH

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTH; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance to APS Chiropractic and Dr. Anthony Siano; Filed By: Cohen, S.; Filed: 03/18/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer for Zu River Acupunture PC; Filed By: Padrucco, J.; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Cohen, S.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Landfair, D.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Landfair, D.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Cohen, S.; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Goldman, A.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTH; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Larkin, W. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less