This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 14:48:12 (UTC).

AMERICAN TRANSIT INSURANCE COMPANY - v. - EUGENIO REYES et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2017 AMERICAN TRANSIT INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EUGENIO REYES. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN TRANSIT INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

STAND-UP MRI OF MANHATTAN, P.C.

ORTHO PROS DME, LLC

COMPLETE CARE

NEW YORK SURGERY CENTER QUEENS, LLC

CIOX HEALTH, LLC

JOSEPH WEINSTEIN, D.O., P.C.

QUEENS PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES, P.C.

APOLLO CHIROPRACTIC P.C.

ORTHOPRO SERVICES, INC.

COMPLETE MEDICAL CARE SERVICES OF NY, P.C.

Eugenio Reyes

LENOX HILL RADIOLOGY AND MEDICAL IMAGING ASSOCIATES, P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TUCKER, DANIEL JASON

Attorney at AMERICAN TRANSIT INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant Attorney

SAYKIN, AARON MAURICE

Attorney at HODGSON RUSS LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Notice of Entry

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Notice of Entry; Filed By: Saykin, A.; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Decision and Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A Decision and Order; Filed By: Saykin, A.; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Saykin, A.; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001); Filed By: Tucker, D.; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance to Lenox Hill Radiology and Medical Imaging Associates, P.C.

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance to Lenox Hill Radiology and Medical Imaging Associates, P.C.; Filed By: Tucker, D.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Saykin, A.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Order

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Order; Filed By: Saykin, A.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Stipulation of Discontinuance

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Saykin, A.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Attorney Letter of Representation & Application for Benefits Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Attorney Letter of Representation & Application for Benefits Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Tucker, D.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Copy of Policy

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Copy of Policy; Filed By: Tucker, D.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Supporting Affidavits

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Supporting Affidavits; Filed By: Tucker, D.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Tucker, D.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service (RJI)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service (RJI); Filed By: Tucker, D.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Tucker, D.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavits of Service (All)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavits of Service (All); Filed By: Tucker, D.; Filed: 04/20/2018; Received: 04/20/2018

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Tucker, D.; Filed: 11/03/2017; Received: 11/03/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Tucker, D.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Notice of Entry; Filed By: Saykin, A.; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Decision and Order; Filed By: Saykin, A.; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Saykin, A.; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001); Filed By: Tucker, D.; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance to Lenox Hill Radiology and Medical Imaging Associates, P.C.; Filed By: Tucker, D.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Saykin, A.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Order; Filed By: Saykin, A.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Saykin, A.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Correspondence; Filed By: Saykin, A.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Appointment Letters; Filed By: Tucker, D.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Attorney Letter of Representation & Application for Benefits Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Tucker, D.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Copy of Policy; Filed By: Tucker, D.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Supporting Affidavits; Filed By: Tucker, D.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Tucker, D.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service (RJI); Filed By: Tucker, D.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Tucker, D.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavits of Service (All); Filed By: Tucker, D.; Filed: 04/20/2018; Received: 04/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Tucker, D.; Filed: 11/03/2017; Received: 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Tucker, D.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less