This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 03:32:01 (UTC).

AMERICAN TRANSIT INSURANCE COMPANY v. ACCELERATED SURGICAL CENTER OF NORTH JERSEY et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 AMERICAN TRANSIT INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ACCELERATED SURGICAL CENTER OF NORTH JERSEY. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN TRANSIT INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

ACCU REFERENCE MEDICAL LAB

LLOYD PSYCHOLOGICAL SERVICES, PLLC

TRI-STATE MULTI-SPECIALTY MEDICAL SERVICES, P.C.

ACCELERATED SURGICAL CENTER OF NORTH JERSEY

ESHEL TREE PT P.C.

ADVANCED COMPREHENSIVE LABORATORY

HAWTHORNE PAIN & SPINE CENTER

G.M. WELLNESS MEDICAL, P.C.

PARK AVENUE CHIROPRACTIC HEALTHCARE, P.C.

MDJ CHIROPRACTIC WELLNESS P.C.

ROH PHYSICAL THERAPY, P.C.

July Gaysynsky

EXON MEDICAL EQUIPMENT, INC.

NEXRAY MEDICAL IMAGING, P.C.

HARBOR MEDICAL GROUP

CROSSTOWN MEDICAL P.C.

HARMONIZED ACUPUNCTURE P.C.

RIDGEWOOD DIAGNOSTIC LABORATORY LLC

Not Yet Classified

Abrams Fensterman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COHEN, STEVEN B.

Attorney at Law Offices of Steven Balson-Cohen, Esq

LARKIN, WILLIAM ROBERT

Attorney at Larkin Farrell, LLC

Defendant Attorneys

NEUWIRTH, STEVEN JAY

Attorney at BAKER, SANDERS, LLC

LITVENKO, VIKTORIYA

Attorney at Viktoriya Litvenko, P.C.

Not Yet Classified Attorney

RYAN, CLIFFORD THOMAS

Attorney at Abrams, Fensterman, Fensterman, Eisman, Formato, Ferrara, Wolf & Carone, LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Larkin, W.; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

DEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands

DEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands; Filed By: Litvenko, V.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Larkin, W.; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Denial of Counterclaims and Cross Counterclaims to Exon Medical Equipment, Inc.

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Denial of Counterclaims and Cross Counterclaims to Exon Medical Equipment, Inc.; Filed By: Cohen, S.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Litvenko, V.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cohen, S.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Larkin, W.; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands; Filed By: Litvenko, V.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Larkin, W.; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Denial of Counterclaims and Cross Counterclaims to Exon Medical Equipment, Inc.; Filed By: Cohen, S.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Litvenko, V.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cohen, S.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less