This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 03:59:25 (UTC).

AMERICAN HOME ASSURANCE COMPANY et al v. SBP NEW YORK, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2019 AMERICAN HOME ASSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SBP NEW YORK, LLC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Lynn R Kotler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Lynn R Kotler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WESTPORT INSURANCE CORPORATION AS SUBROGEE OF 432 PARK AVENUE CONDOMINIUM

CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERICAN HOME ASSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

SBP NEW YORK, LLC

REN INTERIORS, LLC

Lewis A. Sanders

PEMBROOKE & IVES INC.

STH PAINTING, INC.

FRESCO DECORATIVE PAINTING, INC.

RAEL AUTOMATIC SPRINKLER CO., INC.

Alice Sanders

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CANTER, NELSON E

Attorney at McLaughlin & Stern, LLP

LORUSSO, MICHAEL JAMES

Attorney at DUGAN BRINKMANN MAGINNIS & PACE

Defendant Attorneys

O'NEILL, DANIEL E

Attorney at BOEGGEMAN, CORDE, ONDROVIC & HURLEY, P.C.

Ondrovic, Karen

Attorney at BOEGGEMAN, CORDE, ONDROVIC & HURLEY, PC

RUBIN, JASON WAYNE

Attorney at Goldberg, Miller and Rubin

PULLMAN, SAMANTHA LEIGH

Attorney at Goldberg, Miller & Rubin, P.C.

BUNDSCHUH, STEVEN MICHAEL

Attorney at HANNUM FERETIC, PRENDERGAST & MERLINO, LLC

HALL, THOMAS JAMES

Attorney at FABIANI COHEN & HALL, LLP

BIGELOW, JOYCE G

Attorney at Fabiani Cohen & Hall, LLP

FINDLING GITNIK, STEPHANIE B

Attorney at KAUFMAN BORGEEST & RYAN LLP

SHAH, KRUPA A.

Attorney at Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan LLP

CUETER, MATTHEW PETER

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

MALINO, ALEX R

Attorney at BARRY McTIERNAN & MOORE LLC

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

ANSWER Answer to CrossClaims STH

ANSWER Answer to CrossClaims STH; Filed By: O'Neill, D.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

ANSWER Answer to CrossClaims Sanders

ANSWER Answer to CrossClaims Sanders; Filed By: O'Neill, D.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

ANSWER Answer to CrossClaims Ren

ANSWER Answer to CrossClaims Ren; Filed By: O'Neill, D.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

ANSWER Answer to CrossClaims Rael

ANSWER Answer to CrossClaims Rael; Filed By: O'Neill, D.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

ANSWER Answer to CrossClaims Pembrooke

ANSWER Answer to CrossClaims Pembrooke; Filed By: O'Neill, D.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars on Cross-Claims

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars on Cross-Claims; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Reply to Cross-Claim from Fresco Decorative Painting, Inc.

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Reply to Cross-Claim from Fresco Decorative Painting, Inc.; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Expert Witness Information

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Expert Witness Information; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

DEMAND FOR: Combined Demands

DEMAND FOR: Combined Demands; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice for Discovery and Inspection

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice for Discovery and Inspection; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

ANSWER Answer to Complaint

ANSWER Answer to Complaint; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Access Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - C Access Agreement; Filed By: Canter, N.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Assumption of Alteration Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - B Assumption of Alteration Agreement; Filed By: Canter, N.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A The Alteration Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - A The Alteration Agreement; Filed By: Canter, N.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Canter, N.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

133 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to CrossClaims STH; Filed By: O'Neill, D.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to CrossClaims Sanders; Filed By: O'Neill, D.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to CrossClaims Ren; Filed By: O'Neill, D.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to CrossClaims Rael; Filed By: O'Neill, D.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to CrossClaims Pembrooke; Filed By: O'Neill, D.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars on Cross-Claims; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Reply to Cross-Claim from Fresco Decorative Painting, Inc.; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affirmation of Service; Filed By: Lorusso, M.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Collateral Source Information; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Expert Witness Information; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Combined Demands; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice for Discovery and Inspection; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to Complaint; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Access Agreement; Filed By: Canter, N.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Assumption of Alteration Agreement; Filed By: Canter, N.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A The Alteration Agreement; Filed By: Canter, N.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Canter, N.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less